EP2882198 - RECEPTION DEVICE, RECEPTION METHOD, TRANSMISSION DEVICE, AND TRANSMISSION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saturn Licensing LLC 25 Madison Avenue New York, NY 10022-3211 / US | [2017/45] |
Former [2015/24] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAZATO, Naohisa c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
YAMAGISHI, Yasuaki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
DEWA, Yoshiharu c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
KITAHARA, Jun c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 05 /
EYER, Mark c/o SONY ELECTRONICS INC. 1 Sony Drive Park Ridge, New Jersey 07656 / US | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/14] |
Former [2015/24] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 13825085.7 | 22.07.2013 | [2017/14] | WO2013JP69779 | Priority number, date | US201261677752P | 31.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261677752 P | US201313777693 | 26.02.2013 Original published format: US201313777693 | [2015/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014021126 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2882198 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2882198 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/435, H04N21/81 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
H04N21/8126 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N21/41 (KR);
H04N21/43 (KR);
H04N21/6125 (US);
H04N21/8166 (EP,CN,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/24] | H04N21/435 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG, EMPFANGSVERFAHREN, ÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2015/24] | English: | RECEPTION DEVICE, RECEPTION METHOD, TRANSMISSION DEVICE, AND TRANSMISSION METHOD | [2015/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION, PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION, DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2015 | Translation filed | 15.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 19.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17164718.3 / EP3240293 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | HR | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | MK | 05.04.2017 | RS | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SM | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | NO | 05.07.2017 | IE | 22.07.2017 | LU | 22.07.2017 | MT | 22.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/52] | CY | 05.04.2017 | |
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 22.07.2017 | ||
LU | 22.07.2017 | ||
MT | 22.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | CY | 05.04.2017 | |
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 22.07.2017 | ||
LU | 22.07.2017 | ||
MT | 22.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | EE | 05.04.2017 | |
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 22.07.2017 | ||
LU | 22.07.2017 | ||
MT | 22.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | EE | 05.04.2017 | |
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 22.07.2017 | ||
LU | 22.07.2017 | ||
MT | 22.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | EE | 05.04.2017 | |
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 22.07.2017 | ||
LU | 22.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | EE | 05.04.2017 | |
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 22.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | EE | 05.04.2017 | |
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 05.04.2017 | |
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | HR | 05.04.2017 | |
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | HR | 05.04.2017 | |
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012050619 (KITAZATO NAOHISA [JP], et al) [I] 1-4,6-8 * paragraphs [0021] - [0040] - [ 181] - [0196]; figures 20-23; claims 1-5 *; | [A]US2006236334 (LUCCISANO ALEXANDER [CA], et al) [A] 1-4,6-8 * paragraph [0025] * | International search | [A]JP2007116717 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JP2012070351 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2011124690 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) | Examination | EP2755384 | by applicant | JP2011066556 |