EP2881035 - SUBJECT INFORMATION DETECTION UNIT, SUBJECT INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, ELECTRIC TOOTHBRUSH DEVICE, ELECTRIC SHAVER DEVICE, SUBJECT INFORMATION DETECTION DEVICE, AGING DEGREE EVALUATION METHOD, AND AGING DEGREE EVALUATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Holdings Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | For all designated states Bifrostec Inc. 2-38 Kandajimboh-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGAWA, Hiroshi c/o SaLusTek Inc. 2-10-26, Higashi-Asahina Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa, 236-0033 / JP | 02 /
OKUMOTO, Atsushi c/o The KAITEKI Institute Inc. 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 03 /
TAKEUCHI, Atsuo c/o The KAITEKI Institute Inc. 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 04 /
TANAKA, Eiji c/o The KAITEKI Institute Inc. 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/24] | Application number, filing date | 13825321.6 | 30.07.2013 | WO2013JP70633 | Priority number, date | JP20120168469 | 30.07.2012 Original published format: JP 2012168469 | JP20120185503 | 24.08.2012 Original published format: JP 2012185503 | JP20120217706 | 28.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012217706 | JP20120217707 | 28.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012217707 | JP20130156335 | 29.07.2013 Original published format: JP 2013156335 | JP20130156336 | 29.07.2013 Original published format: JP 2013156336 | [2015/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014021335 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2881035 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/02, A61B5/0452, A61B5/08, A61B5/1455, A61C17/22, B26B19/48, A61B5/00, A61B5/0205, A61B5/021, A61B5/024 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
A61B5/0205 (EP,US);
A61C17/22 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/02 (CN);
A61B5/08 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/14552 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/349 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/6803 (EP,US);
A61B5/6817 (EP,US);
A61B5/6826 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/7203 (EP,US);
A61B7/04 (US);
A61B5/02108 (EP,US);
A61B5/02405 (US);
A61B5/02416 (US);
A61B5/02438 (EP,US);
A61B5/0245 (EP,US);
A61B5/14551 (US);
A61B5/225 (EP,US);
A61B5/352 (EP,US);
A61B5/6887 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/24] | A61B5/0245, A61B5/0452, A61B5/08, A61B5/1455, A61C17/22, B26B19/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Title | German: | EINHEIT ZUR ERKENNUNG VON PERSONENINFORMATIONEN, VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON PERSONENINFORMATIONEN, ELEKTRISCHE ZAHNBÜRSTE, RASIERAPPARAT, VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG VON PERSONENINFORMATIONEN, VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWERTUNG EINES ALTERUNGSGRADES UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSWERTUNG EINES ALTERUNGSGRADES | [2015/24] | English: | SUBJECT INFORMATION DETECTION UNIT, SUBJECT INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, ELECTRIC TOOTHBRUSH DEVICE, ELECTRIC SHAVER DEVICE, SUBJECT INFORMATION DETECTION DEVICE, AGING DEGREE EVALUATION METHOD, AND AGING DEGREE EVALUATION DEVICE | [2015/24] | French: | UNITÉ DE DÉTECTION D'INFORMATION DE SUJET, DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATION DE SUJET, DISPOSITIF DE BROSSE À DENTS ÉLECTRIQUE, DISPOSITIF DE RASOIR ÉLECTRIQUE, DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'INFORMATION DE SUJET, PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION DU DEGRÉ DE VIEILLISSEMENT, ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉVALUATION DU DEGRÉ DE VIEILLISSEMENT | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2015 | Translation filed | 27.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 11.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/16] | 25.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO03088841 (SOUTHWEST RES INST [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] * [A] 3-7[I] 2; | [XI]US2008146890 (LEBOEUF STEVEN FRANCIS [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0109] * * figures 5, 8 * [I] 2-7 | International search | [A]JPH06181920 (MIZOBE KUNITAKA); | [Y]JPH10503021 (SIEMENS AG.); | [A]JP2002186075 (YAMAUCHI GORO, et al); | [A]JP2004113618 (TANITA SEISAKUSHO KK); | [A]JP2005080722 (SOSEI DENSHI KK); | [X]US2010179440 (LEE SANG SUK [KR], et al); | [Y]JP2010207553 (WATANABE YOSHIJIRO) | by applicant | JPS63154153 | JPH1156799 | JP2001178691 | JP2005168884 | JP2006505300 | JP2006055501 | JP2008173160 | JP2010022572 | JP2010115431 | JP2010184041 | JP2011030984 | - C.-K. PENG; S. HAVLIN; H. E. STANLEY; A. L. GOLDBERGER, "Quantification of scaling exponents and crossover phenomenain in non-stationary heartbeat time series", CHAOS, (1995), vol. 5, pages 82 - 87 | - "Cyoujyu Jidai No Kagaku To Shakai No Kousou", HIROKO AKIYAMA, Science, IWANAMI-SHOTEN, (2010), pages 59 - 64 |