EP2881425 - BLACK POROUS POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE MEMBRANE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, GAS-PERMEABLE MEMBRANE AND VENTILATION MEMBER USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/24] | POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE BLACK POROUS MEMBRANE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND BREATHABLE MEMBRANE AND BREATHABLE MATERIAL USING SAME | ||
[2021/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI, Masaaki c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
HORIE, Yuri c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2015/24] | 01 /
MORI, Masaaki c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | ||
02 /
HORIE, Yuri c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2021/30] |
Former [2015/24] | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13825359.6 | 03.06.2013 | [2021/30] | WO2013JP03494 | Priority number, date | JP20120171794 | 02.08.2012 Original published format: JP 2012171794 | [2015/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014020812 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2881425 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2881425 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/00, B01D39/16, B01D71/36, B29C55/14, D06P3/00, B29K27/18, B29K105/04, B29L7/00, // B01D67/00, B01D69/02, B29C55/00, B29K105/00, C08L27/18, D06P7/00 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
B01D71/36 (EP,KR,US);
B01D39/16 (KR);
B01D39/1692 (EP,US);
B01D67/002 (EP,KR,US);
B01D67/0027 (EP,KR,US);
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B29C55/005 (EP,US);
B29C55/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08L27/18 (US);
D06P3/00 (KR);
D06P7/005 (EP,US);
B01D2325/38 (EP,US);
B29K2027/18 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0032 (EP,US);
B29K2105/04 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/24] | C08J9/00, B01D39/16, B01D71/36, B29C55/14, D06P3/00, B29K27/18, B29K105/04, B29L7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWARZE PORÖSE POLYTETRAFLUORETHYLENMEMBRAN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE GASDURCHLÄSSIGE MEMBRAN UND DIESE VERWENDENDES ENTGASUNGSELEMENT | [2021/07] | English: | BLACK POROUS POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE MEMBRANE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, GAS-PERMEABLE MEMBRANE AND VENTILATION MEMBER USING SAME | [2021/07] | French: | MEMBRANE NOIRE POREUSE EN POLYTÉTRAFLUOROÉTHYLÈNE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET MEMBRANE PERMÉABLE AUX GAZ ET MEMBRE DE VENTILATION UTILISANT CELLE-CI | [2021/07] |
Former [2015/24] | SCHWARZE PORÖSE POLYTETRAFLUORETHYLENMEMBRAN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE ATMUNGSAKTIVE MEMBRAN UND ATMUNGSAKTIVES MATERIAL DAMIT | ||
Former [2015/24] | POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE BLACK POROUS MEMBRANE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND BREATHABLE MEMBRANE AND BREATHABLE MATERIAL USING SAME | ||
Former [2015/24] | MEMBRANE NOIRE POREUSE EN POLYTÉTRAFLUOROÉTHYLÈNE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET MEMBRANE PERMÉABLE À L'AIR ET MATÉRIAU PERMÉABLE À L'AIR UTILISANT CELLE-CI | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2015 | Translation filed | 24.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 29.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2019 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.06.2013 | AL | 28.07.2021 | AT | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | CZ | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | ES | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | IT | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | NL | 28.07.2021 | PL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | RS | 28.07.2021 | SE | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | TR | 28.07.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 03.06.2013 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 03.06.2013 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 03.06.2013 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001011779 (JAPAN GORE TEX INC) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * claim 3 * * Example *; | [XI]US2010104845 (MACLENNAN ANDREW JAMES [GB], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0016] , [0013] * * claims 1,6 * [I] 5,6; | [X]JP2011052180 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * claims 1-5 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0016] , [0022] * * figures 1-5 *; | [X] - Porex, "Porex Porous PTFE Materials for Medical, Analytical and Industrial Applications", (20101231), URL: http://www.porex.com/files/documents/porous-ptfe-materials.pdf, (20160225), XP055253229 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH03199475 (NISHIKAWA RUBBER CO LTD); | [A]JPH0827304 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [A]JPH10165787 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [A]JP2011052180 (NITTO DENKO CORP) | by applicant | JPH07289865 | JPH0827304 | JP2004083811 |