EP2881247 - RIGID CORE FOR FORMING TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOHARA Kei c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd. 6-9 Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/40] | Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/24] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13825648.2 | 06.06.2013 | [2018/40] | WO2013JP65729 | Priority number, date | JP20120168704 | 30.07.2012 Original published format: JP 2012168704 | [2015/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014020991 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2881247 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2881247 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/06, B29D30/12 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
B29D30/12 (EP,US);
B29D30/0661 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/24] | B29D30/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STARRER KERN ZUM FORMEN EINES REIFENS | [2015/24] | English: | RIGID CORE FOR FORMING TIRE | [2015/24] | French: | NOYAU RIGIDE POUR FORMATION DE PNEUMATIQUE | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2015 | Translation filed | 06.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 10.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.06.2013 | AL | 03.10.2018 | AT | 03.10.2018 | CY | 03.10.2018 | CZ | 03.10.2018 | DK | 03.10.2018 | EE | 03.10.2018 | ES | 03.10.2018 | FI | 03.10.2018 | HR | 03.10.2018 | IT | 03.10.2018 | LT | 03.10.2018 | LV | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | MK | 03.10.2018 | MT | 03.10.2018 | NL | 03.10.2018 | PL | 03.10.2018 | RO | 03.10.2018 | RS | 03.10.2018 | SE | 03.10.2018 | SI | 03.10.2018 | SK | 03.10.2018 | SM | 03.10.2018 | TR | 03.10.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | NO | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IS | 03.02.2019 | PT | 03.02.2019 | GB | 06.06.2019 | IE | 06.06.2019 | LU | 06.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 06.06.2013 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
MT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
GB | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 06.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 06.06.2013 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
GB | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 06.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
GB | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 06.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
GB | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 06.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
GB | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 06.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 03.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1250504 (RAY WILLIAM F [US]) [A] 1-3 * figure - *; | [A]US1392347 (THOMAS MIDGLEY) [A] 1-3 * figure - *; | [X]DE2110508 (SEMPERIT GUMMIWERK GMBH DEUTSC) [X] 1-3 * figure - *; | [A]EP0893237 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * figure - *; | [XD]JP2011167979 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [XD] 1* figure - * | International search | [A]US1466527 (GUILEY ARTHUR J); | [A]US1633263 (MORELAND LESTER A); | [A]JP2000084937 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]US2010116439 (LUNDELL DENNIS ALAN [US]) | by applicant | JP2011161896 | JP2011167979 |