EP2881077 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING DENTAL MILL BLANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/24] | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING DENTAL MILL BLANK | ||
[2018/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Noritake Dental Inc. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Koichi c/o Kuraray Noritake Dental Inc 1-1-3, Otemachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | 02 /
KAMEYA, Takehiro c/o Kuraray Noritake Dental Inc 2-28, Kurashiki-cho, Tainai-shi Niigata 959-2653 / JP | 03 /
ISHINO, Hiroshige c/o Kuraray Noritake Dental Inc 2-28, Kurashiki-cho, Tainai-shi Niigata 959-2653 / JP | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/01] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2015/24] | Gallagher, Kirk James D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13826054.2 | 30.07.2013 | [2019/01] | WO2013JP70650 | Priority number, date | JP20120170294 | 31.07.2012 Original published format: JP 2012170294 | [2015/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014021343 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2881077 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2881077 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/087, A61C13/00 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
A61C13/0006 (EP,US);
A61C13/0004 (EP,US);
A61C13/0022 (EP,US);
A61C13/082 (EP,US);
A61C13/087 (EP,US);
A61K6/884 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DENTALEN ROHLINGS | [2019/01] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING DENTAL MILL BLANK | [2019/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION DE PRÉFORME DENTAIRE | [2019/01] |
Former [2015/24] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ROHLINGS FÜR EINE DENTALFRÄSE | ||
Former [2015/24] | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING DENTAL MILL BLANK | ||
Former [2015/24] | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION DE CIMENT DENTAIRE BLANC BROYÉ | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2015 | Translation filed | 26.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 25.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2013 | AL | 02.01.2019 | AT | 02.01.2019 | CY | 02.01.2019 | CZ | 02.01.2019 | DK | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | ES | 02.01.2019 | FI | 02.01.2019 | HR | 02.01.2019 | LT | 02.01.2019 | LV | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | MK | 02.01.2019 | MT | 02.01.2019 | PL | 02.01.2019 | RO | 02.01.2019 | RS | 02.01.2019 | SE | 02.01.2019 | SI | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | SM | 02.01.2019 | TR | 02.01.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | NO | 02.04.2019 | GR | 03.04.2019 | IS | 02.05.2019 | PT | 02.05.2019 | IE | 30.07.2019 | LU | 30.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 30.07.2013 | |
AL | 02.01.2019 | ||
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
MT | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.07.2019 | ||
LU | 30.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 30.07.2013 | |
AL | 02.01.2019 | ||
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.07.2019 | ||
LU | 30.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.07.2019 | ||
LU | 30.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.07.2019 | ||
LU | 30.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0803241 (G C DENTAL PRODUCTS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* figure 1 *; | [XI]JP2001279106 (TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORP, et al) [X] 1,3,5,9,13,15 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0021] * [I] 10,11,14; | [A]US2005164045 (ROTHBRUST FRANK [AT], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038] * * claims 1-6 * * figure 5 *; | [XI]US2011318402 (AHN EDWARD S [US]) [X] 1-4,9-11,13-15 * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0047] * [I] 5-8,12 | International search | [A]US3990149 (NEDWIG OTTO); | [A]JPH0285205 (KIMURA HIROSHI); | [A]JPH0284952 (KIMURA HIROSHI); | [A]JP2000185058 (UNIV BOSTON); | [A]JP2004324091 (DAIKEN TRADE & INDUSTRY); | [A]WO2010101523 (FORSKARPATENT I SYD AB [SE], et al); | [A]JP2011528597 (VITA ZAHNFABRIK H. RAUTER GMBH & CO. KG); | [A]JP2012501783 (SADOUN, MICHAEL); | [A] - LI-HONG HE ET AL., "A novel polymer infiltrated ceramic dental material", DENTAL MATERIALS, (2011), vol. 27, pages 527 - 534, XP019924297 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10856-011-4350-3 | by applicant | JPS58110414 | JPH093109 | JPH10245525 | JPH10323353 | JP2003529386 | JP2008115136 | WO2009133913 | WO2009154301 | JP2012501783 | WO2012042911 | JP2012087204 | - DENTAL MATERIALS, (2011), vol. 27, pages 527 - 534 |