EP2880512 - FLEXIBLE APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING OPERATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Han-sung 102-504 Byeoksan 3-danji Apt. Siheung 2-dong Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-765 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Geun-ho 703-1702 Jeongdeunmaeul Hanjin 7-danji Apt. Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 153-765 / KR | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/14] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2015/24] | Jenkins, Richard Gavin HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13826483.3 | 30.07.2013 | [2020/14] | WO2013KR06850 | Priority number, date | KR20120083234 | 30.07.2012 Original published format: KR 20120083234 | [2015/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014021616 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2880512 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2880512 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/033, G06F3/048, G06F3/041, G06F3/0484, H04M1/02, G06F1/16 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
G06F1/1652 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/01 (RU);
G01B11/24 (KR,US);
G06F1/1626 (KR);
G06F1/1643 (KR);
G06F1/1694 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/033 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0346 (KR);
G06F3/041 (KR);
G06F3/045 (RU);
G06F3/0481 (KR);
G06F3/0484 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0487 (KR);
G06F3/0488 (RU);
G06F3/14 (KR);
H04M1/0268 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/24] | G06F3/01, G06F3/03, G06F3/048, G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE VORRICHTUNG UND BETRIEBSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2015/24] | English: | FLEXIBLE APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING OPERATION THEREOF | [2015/24] | French: | APPAREIL FLEXIBLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE SON FONCTIONNEMENT | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 14.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.10.2019 | 22.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2018 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2013 | AL | 01.04.2020 | AT | 01.04.2020 | CY | 01.04.2020 | CZ | 01.04.2020 | DK | 01.04.2020 | EE | 01.04.2020 | ES | 01.04.2020 | FI | 01.04.2020 | HR | 01.04.2020 | IT | 01.04.2020 | LT | 01.04.2020 | LV | 01.04.2020 | MC | 01.04.2020 | MK | 01.04.2020 | MT | 01.04.2020 | NL | 01.04.2020 | PL | 01.04.2020 | RO | 01.04.2020 | RS | 01.04.2020 | SE | 01.04.2020 | SI | 01.04.2020 | SK | 01.04.2020 | SM | 01.04.2020 | TR | 01.04.2020 | BG | 01.07.2020 | NO | 01.07.2020 | GR | 02.07.2020 | IE | 30.07.2020 | LU | 30.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | FR | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | IS | 01.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.07.2013 | |
AL | 01.04.2020 | ||
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
MT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
TR | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IE | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 30.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
TR | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IE | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 30.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IE | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 30.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
LU | 30.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
LU | 30.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 01.04.2020 | |
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | BG | 01.07.2020 | |
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | BG | 01.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006238494 (NARAYANASWAMI CHANDRASEKHAR [US], et al) [A] 4,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] *; | [A]US2010088061 (HORODEZKY SAMUEL JACOB [US], et al) [A] 8 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0070] *; | [XI]US2010141605 (KANG TAE YOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,10-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0089] * [I] 2,4,5,8,9; | [IA]US2011057873 (GEISSLER JAN [DE], et al) [I] 1,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0061] *[A] 2-12,14,15 | International search | [A]US2010045705 (VERTEGAAL ROEL [CA], et al); | [A]US2011084898 (EBBELING DANIEL [US], et al); | [X]US2011095975 (HWANG YONG JIN [KR], et al); | [Y]US2011187681 (KIM JAE MONG [KR], et al); | [A]EP2479658 (RESEARCH IN MOTION CORP [US]) | Examination | US2010056214 | by applicant | US2006238494 | US2010088061 | US2010141605 |