EP2935278 - TRICYCLIC COMPOUNDS FOR INHIBITING THE CFTR CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHMED, Mahbub Srg 5th Floor 5 Devonshire Square London EC2M 4YD / GB | 02 /
ASHALL-KELLY, Alexander Srg 5th Floor 5 Devonshire Square London EC2M 4YD / GB | 03 /
GUERITZ, Louisa Srg 5th Floor 5 Devonshire Square London EC2M 4YD / GB | 04 /
MCKENNA, Jeffrey Novartis Pharmaceuticals UK Limited Wimblehurst Road Horsham Sussex RH12 5AB / GB | 05 /
MCKENNA, Joseph Srg 5th Floor 5 Devonshire Square London EC2M 4YD / GB | 06 /
MUTTON, Simon Srg 5th Floor 5 Devonshire Square London EC2M 4YD / GB | 07 /
PARMAR, Rakesh Srg 5th Floor 5 Devonshire Square London EC2M 4YD / GB | 08 /
SHEPHERD, Jon Srg 5th Floor 5 Devonshire Square London EC2M 4YD / GB | 09 /
WRIGHT, Paul Srg 5th Floor 5 Devonshire Square London EC2M 4YD / GB | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Dyer, James Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | [2015/44] | Application number, filing date | 13826625.9 | 17.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013IB61043 | Priority number, date | US201261739335P | 19.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261739335 P | US201361906141P | 19.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361906141 P | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014097148 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2935278 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2935278 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/14, C07D487/04, C07D495/14, A61K31/519, A61P13/12, A61P1/12 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
C07D513/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/542 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D471/14 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
C07D487/14 (EP,US);
C07D487/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | 20.07.2015 | Title | German: | TRICYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN ZUR HEMMUNG DES CFTR-KANALS | [2015/44] | English: | TRICYCLIC COMPOUNDS FOR INHIBITING THE CFTR CHANNEL | [2015/44] | French: | COMPOSÉS TRICYCLIQUES POUR INHIBER LE CANAL CFTR | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 22.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2013 | AL | 15.03.2017 | AT | 15.03.2017 | CY | 15.03.2017 | CZ | 15.03.2017 | DK | 15.03.2017 | EE | 15.03.2017 | FI | 15.03.2017 | HR | 15.03.2017 | LT | 15.03.2017 | LV | 15.03.2017 | MC | 15.03.2017 | MK | 15.03.2017 | NL | 15.03.2017 | PL | 15.03.2017 | RO | 15.03.2017 | RS | 15.03.2017 | SE | 15.03.2017 | SI | 15.03.2017 | SK | 15.03.2017 | SM | 15.03.2017 | TR | 15.03.2017 | BG | 15.06.2017 | NO | 15.06.2017 | GR | 16.06.2017 | IS | 15.07.2017 | PT | 17.07.2017 | IE | 17.12.2017 | LU | 17.12.2017 | MT | 17.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 17.12.2013 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MK | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
TR | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 17.12.2013 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MK | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 17.12.2013 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.12.2013 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 15.03.2017 | |
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2012166658 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 10 ** claims 1, 7 * | by applicant | WO2004078163 | - SHEPPARD ET AL., PHYSIOL. REV., (1999), vol. 79, pages 23 - 45 | - GADSBY ET AL., NATURE, (2006), vol. 40, pages 477 - 83 | - THIAGARAJAH; VERKMAN, CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS, (2012), vol. 92, no. 3, pages 287 - 290 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PRINTING COMPANY, (1990), pages 1289 - 1329 | - QUINTON, PHYSIOL. REV., (1999), vol. 79, pages S3 - S22 | - BOUCHER, EUR. RESPIR. J, (2004), vol. 23, pages 146 - 58 | - O'SULLIVAN ET AL., AM. J KIDNEY DIS., (1998), vol. 32, pages 976 - 983 | - SULLIVAN ET AL., PHYSIOL. REV., (1998), vol. 78, pages 1165 - 91 | - STRONG ET AL., J CLIN. INVEST., (1994), vol. 93, pages 347 - 54 | - MALL ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2004), vol. 126, pages 32 - 41 | - HANAOKA ET AL., AM. J PHYSIOL., (1996), vol. 270, pages C389 - C399 | - KUNZELMANN ET AL., PHYSIOL. REV., (2002), vol. 82, pages 245 - 289 | - DAVIDOW ET AL., KIDNEY INT., (1996), vol. 50, pages 208 - 18 | - LI ET AL., KIDNEY INT., (2004), vol. 66, pages 1926 - 38 | - AI-AWQATI, J CLIN. INVEST., (2002), vol. 110, pages 1599 - 1601 | - THIAGARAJAH ET AL., CURR. OPIN. PHARMACOL., (2003), vol. 3, pages 594 - 99 | - CLARK ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 257, pages 1125 - 28 | - GABRIEL ET AL., SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 266, pages 107 - 109 | - KUNZELMANN; MALL, PHYSIOL. REV., (2002), vol. 82, pages 245 - 89 | - FIELD, M., J CLIN. INVEST., (2003), vol. 111, pages 931 - 43 | - THIAGARAJAH ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2003), vol. 126, pages 511 - 519 | - HAMILL 0; MARTY A; NEHER E; SAKMANN B; SIGWORTH F., "Improved patch-clamp techniques for high resolution current recording from cells and cell-free membrane patches", PFLUGERS ARCHIVE, (1981), vol. 391, doi:doi:10.1007/BF00656997, pages 85 - 100, XP000196663 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00656997 | - FINKEL A; WITTEL A; YANG N; HANDRAN S; HUGHES J; COSTANTIN J., "Population patch clamp improves data consistency and success rates in the measurement of ionic currents", J BIOMOL SCREEN., (200608), vol. 11, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1177/1087057106288050, pages 488 - 96, XP008097818 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/1087057106288050 | - J.AM.CHEM.SOC., (1959), vol. 81, pages 2705 - 2715 | - TRUJILLO, D.A.; MCMAHON, W.A.; LYLE, R.E., "Synthesised by a modified Method of", J. ORG. CHEM., (1987), vol. 52, pages 2932 - 2933 |