EP2941571 - VALVE FOR THE TEMPERATURE-DEPENDENT CONTROL OF AT LEAST ONE HYDRAULIC LOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hydac Drive Center GmbH Kiesgräble 13 89129 Langenau / DE | [2015/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSCH, Ralf Altheimer Weg 3 89177 Börslingen / DE | [2015/46] | Representative(s) | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/46] | Bartels, Martin Erich Arthur Patentanwälte Bartels und Partner Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 13826733.1 | 21.12.2013 | [2015/46] | WO2013EP03936 | Priority number, date | DE20131000121 | 04.01.2013 Original published format: DE102013000121 | [2015/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014106535 | Date: | 10.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2941571 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F04D25/02, F01P7/04, F04D27/00 | [2015/46] | CPC: |
F04D25/02 (EP,US);
F04D27/004 (EP,US);
G05D23/02 (US);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/46] | Title | German: | VENTIL ZUR TEMPERATURABHÄNGIGEN ANSTEUERUNG MINDESTENS EINES HYDRAULISCHEN VERBRAUCHERS | [2015/46] | English: | VALVE FOR THE TEMPERATURE-DEPENDENT CONTROL OF AT LEAST ONE HYDRAULIC LOAD | [2015/46] | French: | SOUPAPE PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER AU MOINS UN CONSOMMATEUR HYDRAULIQUE EN FONCTION DE LA TEMPÉRATURE | [2015/46] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/46] | 09.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3407747 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE19601376 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1* figure 1 *; | [XA]DE102010007247 (HYDAC FILTERTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * * figures 2,4 * [A] 2-14 | by applicant | DE102012008480 |