EP2936595 - SEALING FRAME PROVIDING ELECTRIC INSULATION FOR A WATER ELECTROLYSIS REACTOR (SOEC) OR A FUEL CELL (SOFC) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/44] | ELECTRICAL INSULATION AND SEALING SURROUND FOR WATER ELECTROLYSIS REACTOR (SOEC) OR FUEL CELL (SOFC) | ||
[2016/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, Rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2016/49] |
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLANQUE, Michel 241 avenue de Grenoble Seyssins / FR | 02 /
DI IORIO, Stéphane 655 avenue Léopold Fabre F-38250 Lans-en-vercors / FR | 03 /
REYTIER, Magali 15 allée des Peupliers F-38250 Villard De Lans / FR | 04 /
SZYNAL, Philippe Le Villard F-73800 Chignin / FR | [2016/49] |
Former [2015/44] | 01 /
PLANQUE, Michel 241 avenue de Grenoble Seyssins / FR | ||
02 /
DI IORIO, Stéphane 655 avenue Léopold Fabre F-38250 Lans-en-vercors / FR | |||
03 /
REYTIER, Magali 15 allée des Peupliers F-38250 Villard De Lans / FR | |||
04 /
SZYNAL, Philippe 7 boulevard des Côtes F-73100 Aix-les-bains / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2015/44] | Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 13826876.8 | 18.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013IB61109 | Priority number, date | FR20120062611 | 21.12.2012 Original published format: FR 1262611 | [2015/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014097191 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2936595 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2936595 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/0273, H01M8/0282, H01M8/12, C25B1/10, C25B1/12, C25B9/08 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
H01M8/0282 (EP,US);
H01M8/0271 (US);
C25B1/04 (EP,US);
C25B9/05 (EP,US);
C25B9/19 (EP,US);
C25B9/73 (EP,US);
H01M8/0258 (US);
H01M8/026 (US);
H01M8/0273 (EP,US);
H01M8/2425 (US);
H01M8/2432 (EP);
H01M8/2483 (EP);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0074 (US);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/44] | H01M8/02, C25B1/08, C25B9/20, H01M8/12, H01M8/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER ISOLIERUNGS- UND DICHTUNGSRAHMEN FÜR EINEN WASSERELEKTROLYSEREAKTOR (SOEC) ODER EINE BRENNSTOFFZELLE (SOFC) | [2016/30] | English: | SEALING FRAME PROVIDING ELECTRIC INSULATION FOR A WATER ELECTROLYSIS REACTOR (SOEC) OR A FUEL CELL (SOFC) | [2016/30] | French: | CADRE D'ISOLATION ÉLECTRIQUE ET D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ POUR RÉACTEUR D'ÉLECTROLYSE DE L'EAU (SOEC) OU PILE À COMBUSTIBLE (SOFC) | [2015/44] |
Former [2015/44] | ELEKTRISCHE ISOLIERUNGS- UND DICHTUNGSEINFASSUNG FÜR EINEN WASSERELEKTROLYSEREAKTOR ODER EINE BRENNSTOFFZELLE | ||
Former [2015/44] | ELECTRICAL INSULATION AND SEALING SURROUND FOR WATER ELECTROLYSIS REACTOR (SOEC) OR FUEL CELL (SOFC) | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 08.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2013 | AL | 07.12.2016 | AT | 07.12.2016 | CY | 07.12.2016 | CZ | 07.12.2016 | EE | 07.12.2016 | ES | 07.12.2016 | HR | 07.12.2016 | LT | 07.12.2016 | LV | 07.12.2016 | MC | 07.12.2016 | MK | 07.12.2016 | MT | 07.12.2016 | NL | 07.12.2016 | PL | 07.12.2016 | RO | 07.12.2016 | RS | 07.12.2016 | SE | 07.12.2016 | SI | 07.12.2016 | SK | 07.12.2016 | SM | 07.12.2016 | TR | 07.12.2016 | IE | 18.12.2016 | LU | 18.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | BG | 07.03.2017 | NO | 07.03.2017 | GR | 08.03.2017 | IS | 07.04.2017 | PT | 07.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/46] | HU | 18.12.2013 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
MT | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
TR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IE | 18.12.2016 | ||
LU | 18.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 18.12.2013 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
MT | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
IE | 18.12.2016 | ||
LU | 18.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 18.12.2013 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
IE | 18.12.2016 | ||
LU | 18.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
IE | 18.12.2016 | ||
LU | 18.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | ES | 07.12.2016 | |
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | ES | 07.12.2016 | |
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 07.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2011148769 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | EP2579371 [ ] (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0046] - [0067]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2002106548 (CHUNG BRANDON W [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2004241544 (NAKAISHI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0041] - [0049]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2004048140 (KING GEORGE R [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] , [0045]; figures 3,4 * | by applicant | US2011269059 | US2005186463 |