EP2883906 - CONDUCTIVE CELLULOSE-BASED RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daicel Corporation 3-1, Ofuka-cho Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0011 / JP | [2019/32] |
Former [2015/45] | For all designated states Daicel Corporation 3-1, Ofuka-cho Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0011 / JP | ||
Former [2015/25] | For all designated states Daicel Corporation 3-4-5, Umeda Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA Toshikazu c/o Daicel Corporation 1239 Shinzaike Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1281 / JP | 02 /
SHIMAMOTO Shu c/o Daicel Corporation 18-1 konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8230 / JP | 03 /
OKADA Shizuka c/o Daicel Corporation 1239 Shinzaike Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1281 / JP | [2015/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/25] | Application number, filing date | 13827218.2 | 08.08.2013 | [2019/32] | WO2013JP71520 | Priority number, date | JP20120175786 | 08.08.2012 Original published format: JP 2012175786 | [2015/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014024977 | Date: | 13.02.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2883906 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2883906 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08L1/10, C08K3/04 | [2015/25] | CPC: |
H01B1/24 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/041 (EP,KR,US);
C08L1/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2301/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2201/001 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2201/011 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/042 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/041, C08L1/10 (US,EP);
C08K3/04, C08L1/10 (US);
C08K7/24, C08L1/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEITFÄHIGE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUF CELLULOSEBASIS | [2015/25] | English: | CONDUCTIVE CELLULOSE-BASED RESIN COMPOSITION | [2015/25] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE À BASE DE CELLULOSE CONDUCTRICE | [2015/25] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2015 | Translation filed | 27.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 25.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.08.2013 | AL | 07.08.2019 | AT | 07.08.2019 | CY | 07.08.2019 | CZ | 07.08.2019 | DK | 07.08.2019 | EE | 07.08.2019 | ES | 07.08.2019 | FI | 07.08.2019 | HR | 07.08.2019 | IT | 07.08.2019 | LT | 07.08.2019 | LV | 07.08.2019 | MC | 07.08.2019 | MK | 07.08.2019 | MT | 07.08.2019 | NL | 07.08.2019 | PL | 07.08.2019 | RO | 07.08.2019 | RS | 07.08.2019 | SE | 07.08.2019 | SI | 07.08.2019 | SK | 07.08.2019 | SM | 07.08.2019 | TR | 07.08.2019 | IE | 08.08.2019 | LU | 08.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | BG | 07.11.2019 | NO | 07.11.2019 | GR | 08.11.2019 | IS | 07.12.2019 | PT | 09.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.08.2013 | |
AL | 07.08.2019 | ||
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
MT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 08.08.2019 | ||
LU | 08.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.08.2013 | |
AL | 07.08.2019 | ||
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 08.08.2019 | ||
LU | 08.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 08.08.2019 | ||
LU | 08.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 08.08.2019 | ||
LU | 08.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 08.08.2019 | ||
LU | 08.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 08.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 08.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 07.08.2019 | |
NO | 07.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1471114 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0030] , [0040]; claim 1 * [I] 2-4,6-11; | [IP]US2013140499 (YUE SEONG-HOON [KR], et al) [IP] 1-11* paragraphs [0013] , [0015] , [0036] * | International search | [X]JPS4324547B (EASTMAN KODAK CO.); | [X]JPS4860934 (RICOH CO., LTD.); | [X]JPS5918734 (RICOH KK); | [X]JP2011132466 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [X]JP2011132457 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [X] - C. BASAVARAJA ET AL., "Electromagnetic Interference Shielding of Cellulose Triacetate/ Multiwalled Carbon Nanotube Composite Films", POLYMER COMPOSITES, (2011), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 438 - 444, XP055192722 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pc.21062 | [X] - MEILU LI ET AL., "Cellulose Acetate/Multiwalled Carbon Nanotube Nanocomposites with Improved Mechanical, Thermal, and Electrical Properties", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 118, no. 4, pages 2475 - 2481, XP055192727 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.32591 | [X] - GIL WOO JEON ET AL., "High performance cellulose acetate propionate composites reinforced with exfoliated graphene", COMPOSITES: PART B, (20120109), vol. 43, no. 8, pages 3412 - 3418, XP028941858 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.compositesb.2012.01.023 | by applicant | JPH0977801 | JP2003201301 | - PROGRESS IN POLYMER SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 35, page 357 | - J. POLYM. SCI. PART A POLYM. CHEM., (2006), vol. 44, page 5283 | - CHEMPHYSCHEM, (2004), vol. 5, page 998 | - APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2003), vol. 82, page 1290 | - CURR. APPL. PHYS., (2004), vol. 4, page 577 | - TEZUKA, CARBONYDR. RES., (1995), vol. 273, page 83 | - KAZUO UDA; HIDEO SAITO, JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY OF FIBER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1962), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 105 - 120 |