EP2884849 - SEA CUCUMBER PROCESSING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genesis Group Inc. 3rd Floor Bruneau Centre for Research & Innovation Memorial University P.O. Box 4200, St. John's Newfoundland and Labrador A1C 5S7 / CA | [2015/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGLETON, Joseph 40 Foran Street St. John's Newfoundland and Labrador A1E 4G1 / CA | 02 /
INGERMAN, Mark 195 Petty Harbour Road Petty Harbour Newfoundland and Labrador A0A 3H0 / CA | 03 /
KING, Stephen 9 Joanna Place Paradise, NL A1L 1E6 / CA | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | Hally, Anna-Louise FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 13829243.8 | 15.08.2013 | WO2013CA50632 | Priority number, date | US201261683347P | 15.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261683347 P | [2015/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014026291 | Date: | 20.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2884849 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 20.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A22C25/14, A22C25/00, A22C29/00 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
A22C25/147 (EP,US);
A22C25/00 (EP,US);
A22C25/08 (EP,US);
A22C25/14 (EP,US);
A22C25/145 (EP,US);
A22C29/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/26] | A22C25/14, A22C25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON SEEGURKEN | [2015/26] | English: | SEA CUCUMBER PROCESSING APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2015/26] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE CONCOMBRE DE MER | [2015/26] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 07.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 24.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4008508 (LAPINE ROBERT L, et al) [X] 14,15 * column 1, line 1 - column 5, line 54 * * column 7, line 8 - column 9, line 37 * * figures 1,4,5,8,11-14 * [I] 1-13; | [A]WO2007005349 (COASTSIDE BIO RESOURCES [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US3867740 (LAPINE ROBERT L, et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US5364301 (KESTNER MICHAEL T [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US3947921 (BERK ZEKI) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [X]US2009325474 (BATSON CHESTER L [US]); | [Y]WO2007005349 (COASTSIDE BIO RESOURCES [US], et al) | by applicant | US4008508 |