EP2997522 - PROTECTIVE STRIPE FOR BANK CARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skimprot, Limited Liability Company 16 Abagar Street j.k. Gorublyane 1138 Sofia / BG | [2016/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSAPREV, Nikolay Marinov 11 Slavishte Street entrance B floor 5 app. 3 BG-1421 Sofia / BG | 02 /
CHOBANOV, Dimitar Ivanov j.k Mladost 4 block 439 entrance A app. 11 BG-1715 Sofia / BG | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Manev, Kostadin Chanev Manev & Partners 73, Patriarh Evtimii Blvd., floor 1 1463 Sofia / BG | [2016/12] | Application number, filing date | 13830031.4 | 18.12.2013 | [2016/12] | WO2013BG00055 | Priority number, date | BG20130111466 | 13.05.2013 Original published format: BG 11146613 | [2016/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014183174 | Date: | 20.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2997522 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/06 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
G06K19/06196 (EP,RU,US);
G06K19/06187 (RU,US);
G07F7/0813 (EP,RU,US);
G07F7/086 (EP,RU,US);
G07F7/0866 (EP,RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Title | German: | SCHÜTZENDE STREIFEN FÜR BANKKARTEN | [2016/12] | English: | PROTECTIVE STRIPE FOR BANK CARDS | [2016/12] | French: | BANDE PROTECTRICE POUR CARTES BANCAIRES | [2016/12] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 07.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/17] | 13.12.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.04.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.06.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2006243791 (MCGEE CHRIS [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] - [0013] - [0027] , [0030]; figure 3 *[A] 2; | [XA]WO2011115492 (VICAIR B V [NL], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, line 15 - page 3, line 20 * * page 5, lines 1-26 * * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 31; figures 1-6 * [A] 2 | Examination | US2008305365 |