EP2875739 - ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMREE HI-TECH INC. P.O. Box 905, Quastisky Building Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2015/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Qiuming 3F-5F Building A No.16 Hechang West 3rd Road Zhongkai High-Tech Zone Huizhou Guangdong 516000 / CN | [2015/22] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | Bongiovanni, Simone, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 13830165.0 | 03.09.2013 | WO2013CN82844 | Priority number, date | CN20132496679U | 14.08.2013 Original published format: CN 201320496679 U | [2015/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015021676 | Date: | 19.02.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2875739 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, F16L37/252 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
A24F40/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/22] | A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE ZIGARETTE | [2015/22] | English: | ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE | [2015/22] | French: | CIGARETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2015/22] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2014 | Translation filed | 26.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2014 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 29.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0770809 (SAKURA RUBBER [JP]) [Y] 2 * column 3, line 36 - column 6, line 9 *; | [XY]KR20110003309U (EBACO CO LTD) [X] 1 * see machine translation into English, fifth embodiment;; figure 11 * [Y] 2; | [E]WO2014150773 (ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES INC [US]) [E] 1,2* paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0026] * | International search | [Y]CN1795345 (CAILLAU ETS [FR]); | [A]CN202402855U (BEIJING CONST INSTR TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [Y]CN202618275U (HUIZHOU JIRUI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]US2013081642 (SAFARI ROBERT [US]); | [A]CN103148296 (HUTCHINSON INC); | [A]CN203058297U (DESONIC ELECTRONIC CO LTD) |