EP2887897 - ORTHOPEDIC FASTENER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTG Scientific, LLC c/o The Corporation Trust Company Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2018/46] | For all designated states RTG Scientific LLC c/o The Corporation Trust Company Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | ||
Former [2015/27] | For all designated states Reed, Gary J. 1015 South Soderquist Road Turlock, CA 95380 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REED Gary Jack 2375 El Capitan Dr. Turlock, CA 95380 / US | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/27] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | [2018/29] |
Former [2015/27] | Henze, Lasse, et al Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Kobenhavn K / DK | Application number, filing date | 13830293.0 | 22.08.2013 | [2018/29] | WO2013US56248 | Priority number, date | US201213573128 | 24.08.2012 Original published format: US201213573128 | [2015/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014031884 | Date: | 27.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2887897 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2887897 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/86 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
A61B17/8625 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/866 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/863 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/8635 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORTHOPÄDISCHE BEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2015/27] | English: | ORTHOPEDIC FASTENER DEVICE | [2015/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ORGANE DE FIXATION ORTHOPÉDIQUE | [2015/27] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 16.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2013 | AL | 18.07.2018 | AT | 18.07.2018 | CY | 18.07.2018 | CZ | 18.07.2018 | EE | 18.07.2018 | HR | 18.07.2018 | LT | 18.07.2018 | LV | 18.07.2018 | MC | 18.07.2018 | MK | 18.07.2018 | NL | 18.07.2018 | PL | 18.07.2018 | PT | 18.07.2018 | RO | 18.07.2018 | RS | 18.07.2018 | SI | 18.07.2018 | SK | 18.07.2018 | SM | 18.07.2018 | TR | 18.07.2018 | LU | 22.08.2018 | MT | 22.08.2018 | BG | 18.10.2018 | GR | 19.10.2018 | IS | 18.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 22.08.2013 | |
AL | 18.07.2018 | ||
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PT | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.08.2018 | ||
MT | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.08.2018 | ||
MT | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.08.2018 | ||
MT | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | LT | 18.07.2018 | |
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 18.07.2018 | |
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 18.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6565573 (FERRANTE JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 19; figures 3,4 * [Y] 3-5; | [XY]US2008286720 (REED GARY J [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0047] , [0055] , [0056]; figures 2A,3 * [Y] 3-5; | [X]US6315564 (LEVISMAN RICARDO [AR]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 8; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2010211118 (CHRISTEN ALEXIS [CH], et al) [A] 2 * paragraphs [0035] - [0037]; figures 1-4 * | International search | [X]US6565573 (FERRANTE JOSEPH [US], et al); | [Y]US2012022603 (KIRSCHMAN DAVID LOUIS [US]); | [A]US6048204 (KLARDIE MICHAEL R [US], et al); | [A]US2011195380 (GIORNO THIERRY [US]); | [A]WO9515727 (BURKE DENNIS W [US]) |