EP2889762 - TERMINAL USER INTERFACE MANAGEMENT METHOD AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Wenjun ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
ZHENG, Xingyou ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | Huang, Chongguang Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 13830836.6 | 19.08.2013 | WO2013CN81797 | Priority number, date | CN201210298866 | 21.08.2012 Original published format: CN201210298866 | [2015/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014029313 | Date: | 27.02.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2889762 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
G06F9/451 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/0484 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG DER BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHE EINES ENDGERÄTS UND ENDGERÄT | [2015/27] | English: | TERMINAL USER INTERFACE MANAGEMENT METHOD AND TERMINAL | [2015/27] | French: | TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'INTERFACE UTILISATEUR DE TERMINAL | [2015/27] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2015 | Translation filed | 11.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 29.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US5041967 (EPHRATH ARYE R [US], et al) [I] 1-4,9,10 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 38 * * column 4, line 20 - column 8, line 61 * * figures 3-8 * [Y] 5-8,11-14; | [Y]CN1337811 (XINTAILI COMM TECHN CO LTD BEI [CN]) [Y] 8,14 * page 1, line 13 - line 16 ** page 4, line 16 - line 19 *; | [XY]US2007130125 (HOLTE BJORN [NO]) [X] 1-4,9,10 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0112] * * figures 5c,6a,6b,7a-7-d,8a,8b * [Y] 5-8,11-14 | International search | [A]CN1758794 (CHINA UNITED COMM CO LTD [CN]); | [X]CN102436380 (FUJIAN LIXIN BEIJING TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [XP]CN102855140 (ZTE CORP) |