EP2888988 - PHOTODYNAMIC DIAGNOSIS APPARATUS PROVIDED WITH COLLIMATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SBI Pharmaceuticals Co., Ltd. 6-1, Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-6020 / JP | [2015/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE, Katsushi c/o SBI Pharmaceuticals Co. Ltd. 6-1 Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-6020 / JP | 02 /
HIRAMITSU, Masanori c/o SBI Pharmaceuticals Co. Ltd. 6-1 Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-6020 / JP | 03 /
NAKAJIMA, Motowo c/o SBI Pharmaceuticals Co. Ltd. 6-1 Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-6020 / JP | 04 /
TANAKA, Tohru c/o SBI Pharmaceuticals Co. Ltd. 6-1 Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-6020 / JP | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | Duckett, Anthony Joseph, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13831452.1 | 21.08.2013 | WO2013JP04933 | Priority number, date | JP20120184037 | 23.08.2012 Original published format: JP 2012184037 | [2015/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014030344 | Date: | 27.02.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2888988 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, G01N21/64, A61B5/00, A61B1/04, A61B1/06, A61B1/07, G02B23/26 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
A61B1/00096 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/0071 (US);
A61B1/043 (EP,CN,US);
A61B1/063 (EP,US);
A61B1/07 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/0084 (US);
A61B5/7282 (US);
A61B5/7405 (US);
G01N21/645 (EP,US);
G02B21/0012 (EP,US);
G02B23/2469 (EP,US);
G02B23/26 (EP,US);
A61B1/00167 (EP,US);
A61B1/0607 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0238 (US);
G01N2021/6484 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/27] | A61B1/00, A61B10/00, G01N21/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Title | German: | PHOTODYNAMISCHE DIAGNOSEVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM KOLLIMATOR | [2015/27] | English: | PHOTODYNAMIC DIAGNOSIS APPARATUS PROVIDED WITH COLLIMATOR | [2015/27] | French: | APPAREIL DE DIAGNOSTIC PHOTODYNAMIQUE DOTÉ D'UN COLLIMATEUR | [2015/27] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2015 | Translation filed | 29.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 06.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 28.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003000733 (TOKYO IKEN KK) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0027] ** figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1818013 (NAT UNIV CORP HAMAMATSU [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0015] * * figure 1 *; | [XYI]US2008137363 (HARRIS MARTIN RUSSELL [AU]) [X] 1-3,9 * paragraphs [0085] , [0088] , [0090] * * figure 7 * [Y] 6-8 [I] 4,5; | [YD]JP2010240078 (SBI ALAPROMO CO LTD) [YD] 7 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] *; | [XYI]WO2011083836 (KONICA MINOLTA OPTO INC [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7 * figures 1,2a-2c * [Y] 6,8,9 [I] 4,5; | [Y]WO2011114653 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * figure 3 *; | [Y]WO2012056991 (KONICA MINOLTA OPTO INC [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * figure 1 *; | [P]US2012283576 (TAKIMURA TOSHINORI [US], et al) [P] * paragraphs [0036] , [0040] , [0042] , [0046] * * figures 1,2a-2c *; | [P]EP2548616 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [P] * paragraphs [0001] , [0061] * * figure 3 *; | [P]US2013209034 (JONO JUNICHI [JP], et al) [P] * paragraphs [0045] , [ 0046] * * figure 1 *; | [E]EP2870498 (HARRIS MARTIN RUSSELL [AU]) [E] 1-3,9 * page 14, line 20 - line 37 * | International search | [Y]JP2001299939 (TOKYO IKEN KK); | [Y]JP2003000733 (TOKYO IKEN KK); | [Y]JP2009183459 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [Y]JP2010240078 (SBI ALAPROMO CO LTD); | [Y]JP2011212423 (SONY CORP, et al) | by applicant | JP2004528930 | JP2007303990 | JP2007317871 | JP2010240078 | JP2011001307 |