EP2885719 - MULTIPLE OUTPUT RELAXATION MACHINE LEARNING MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2017 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Insidesales.com Inc. 34 East 1700 South Suite A Provo, UT 84606 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | For all designated states Insidesales.com Inc. 34 East 1700 South Suite A113 Provo, UT 84606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINEZ, Tony, Ramon 892 High Country Drive Orem, UT 84097 / US | 02 /
ZENG, Xinchuan 298 East 950 South Orem, UT 84058 / US | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 13831802.7 | 20.08.2013 | WO2013US55859 | Priority number, date | US201213590028 | 20.08.2012 Original published format: US201213590028 | [2015/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014031685 | Date: | 27.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2885719 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/18 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06N3/04 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP,US);
H04L67/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] | Title | German: | MOR-MASCHINENLERNMODELL | [2015/26] | English: | MULTIPLE OUTPUT RELAXATION MACHINE LEARNING MODEL | [2015/26] | French: | MODÈLE D'APPRENTISSAGE AUTOMATIQUE À RELAXATION DE SORTIES MULTIPLES | [2015/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 09.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003140023 (FERGUSON BRUCE [US], et al); | [A]US7152051 (COMMONS MICHAEL LAMPORT [US], et al); | [A]US2009157571 (SMITH JOHN R [US], et al); | [Y]US2009176580 (HERRMANN MARK E [US], et al); | [A]US2011106735 (WESTON JASON [US], et al); | [A]US2011106743 (DUCHON ANDREW P [US]); | [X]US2011119213 (ELISSEEFF ANDRE [CH], et al); | [A]US2011213741 (SHAMA YAACOV [IL], et al); | [A]US2011270779 (SHOWALTER THOMAS [US]); | [A]US2012203720 (BAKER JAMES K [US]) |