EP2891489 - ENDOPARASITE CONTROL AGENT AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | For all designated states Nihon Nohyaku Co., Ltd. 19-8, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8386 / JP | [2015/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITA, Kiyoshi c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | 02 /
SUWA, Akiyuki c/o Research Center NIHON NOHYAKU CO. LTD. 345 Oyamada-cho Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 03 /
ODA, Masatsugu c/o Research Center NIHON NOHYAKU CO. LTD. 345 Oyamada-cho Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 04 /
TANAKA, Koji c/o Research Center NIHON NOHYAKU CO. LTD. 345 Oyamada-cho Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586-0094 / JP | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/02] |
Former [2015/28] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 13832194.8 | 29.08.2013 | [2018/02] | WO2013JP73077 | Priority number, date | JP20120189499 | 30.08.2012 Original published format: JP 2012189499 | [2015/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014034751 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2891489 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2891489 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/166, A61K31/415, A61K31/44, A61P33/00, C07D213/74, C07D231/16, C07D231/18, C07D231/12, C07D231/20, C07D213/643, C07D213/64, C07D213/61, C07C317/32, C07C323/62, C07C235/60, C07D401/04 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/166 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/415 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,CN,US);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P33/10 (EP);
C07C233/69 (US);
C07C235/46 (US);
C07C235/60 (EP,CN,US);
C07C317/32 (EP,CN,US);
C07C323/42 (US);
C07C323/62 (EP,CN,US);
C07D213/56 (US);
C07D213/61 (EP,CN,US);
C07D213/643 (EP,CN,US);
C07D213/74 (EP,US);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/28] | A61K31/166, A61K31/415, A61K31/44, A61P33/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUR ENDOPARASITENBEKÄMPFUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2015/28] | English: | ENDOPARASITE CONTROL AGENT AND USE THEREOF | [2015/28] | French: | AGENT DE LUTTE CONTRE LES ENDOPARASITES ET SON UTILISATION | [2015/28] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2015 | Translation filed | 23.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 28.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16188554.6 / EP3143994 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2013 | AL | 10.01.2018 | AT | 10.01.2018 | CY | 10.01.2018 | CZ | 10.01.2018 | DK | 10.01.2018 | EE | 10.01.2018 | FI | 10.01.2018 | HR | 10.01.2018 | LT | 10.01.2018 | LV | 10.01.2018 | MC | 10.01.2018 | MK | 10.01.2018 | PL | 10.01.2018 | PT | 10.01.2018 | RO | 10.01.2018 | RS | 10.01.2018 | SE | 10.01.2018 | SI | 10.01.2018 | SK | 10.01.2018 | SM | 10.01.2018 | TR | 10.01.2018 | BG | 10.04.2018 | NO | 10.04.2018 | GR | 11.04.2018 | IS | 10.05.2018 | LU | 29.08.2018 | MT | 29.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 29.08.2013 | |
AL | 10.01.2018 | ||
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2010108616 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-8 * compound of claim 1= fluopyram; pages 14-16; claim 1; table 1 * [Y] 1-8; | [Y]WO2011018170 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0115]; claims 1,5; tables A,B,E-I *; | [Y]WO2005023776 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE SA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-8 * compounds in Table I; page 30, line 31 - page 31, line 16; claims 1,8-10 *; | [XD]WO2008003745 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE SA [FR], et al) [XD] 1-5 * table 1 on page 22;; claim 1 *; | [XP]WO2013064520 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [XP] 1-8 * compounds in Table P;; claims 1,40 *; | [XP]WO2013064521 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [XP] 1-8 * compounds in Table A;; claims 1,48 * | International search | [XP]WO2012118139 (UNIV TOKYO [JP], et al); | [X]WO2008126922 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]JP2012087116 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA); | [Y]WO2007108483 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2008062878 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO0114340 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH01151546 | WO2007060162 | JPS539739 | WO2007108483 | WO2008126922 | WO2008062878 | WO2008101975 | WO2008101976 | WO2008003745 | WO2008003746 | WO2009012998 | WO2009127718 | WO2010106071 | WO2005115994 | WO0142223 | WO03066609 | WO03066610 | WO03099803 | WO03099804 | WO03080628 | - KIYOSHI KITA, KANSEN, (2010), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 310 - 319 |