EP2891242 - A POLYPHASE INDUCTIVE POWER TRANSFER SYSTEM WITH INDIVIDUAL CONTROL OF PHASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Auckland UniServices Limited Level 10 49 Symonds Street Grafton Auckland 1010 / NZ | [2023/29] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states Auckland UniServices Limited Level 10 49 Symonds Street Auckland 1010 / NZ | ||
Former [2018/31] | For all designated states Auckland Uniservices Limited Level 10 70 Symonds Street Auckland 1010 / NZ | ||
Former [2015/28] | For all designated states Auckland Uniservices Limited Level 10 70 Symonds Street Auckland 1010 / NZ | ||
For all designated states Madawala, Udaya Kumara 13 Amapur Place Flat Bush, Manukau 2016 / NZ | |||
For all designated states Thrimawithana, Duleepa Jayanath 2/241 Marua Road Mt Wellington, Auckland 1051 / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MADAWALA, Udaya Kumara 13 Amapur Place Flat Bush Manukau 2016 / NZ | 02 /
THRIMAWITHANA, Duleepa Jayanath 2/241 Marua Road Mt Wellington Auckland 1051 / NZ | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/28] | Noble, Nicholas, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13832921.4 | 28.08.2013 | WO2013NZ00151 | Priority number, date | NZ20120602095 | 28.08.2012 Original published format: NZ 60209512 | [2015/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014035260 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2891242 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/77, H02J7/16, B60L11/18, H02J5/00, H02J7/02 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
H02J50/12 (EP,KR,US);
B60L55/00 (EP,CN,US);
B60L53/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H02J5/005 (CN);
H02J50/005 (KR);
H02J50/10 (US);
H02J50/402 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H02J7/025 (CN);
H02J2310/48 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/00 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,KR,US);
Y02T90/12 (US);
Y02T90/14 (EP,KR,US);
Y02T90/16 (KR,US);
Y04S10/126 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/28] | H02M7/77, H02J7/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Title | German: | MEHRPHASIGES INDUKTIVES STROMÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM MIT EINZELPHASENSTEUERUNG | [2015/28] | English: | A POLYPHASE INDUCTIVE POWER TRANSFER SYSTEM WITH INDIVIDUAL CONTROL OF PHASES | [2015/28] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSFERT DE PUISSANCE INDUCTIVE POLYPHASÉE AVEC COMMANDE INDIVIDUELLE DE PHASES | [2015/28] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 05.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 14.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2020 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.03.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 14.03.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.03.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.11.2015 | 31.08.2017 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2017 | 31.08.2020 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   14.09.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/exclusive | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Licencee: | QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Date: | 22.06.2018 | [2018/40] |
Former [2018/36] | ID: | 01 01/exclusive | |
For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Licencee: | Halo Inductive Power Technologies Limited Channel Islands Guernsey / GB | ||
Date: | 22.06.2018 | ||
[2018/40] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2009045847 (ACCESS BUSINESS GROUP INT LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9,11-14 * page 8, line 25 - page 10, line 17; figures 1,2; claim 6 * [Y] 3,5,8,10,15; | [Y]WO2011016736 (AUCKLAND UNISERVICES LTD [NZ], et al) [Y] 3,5* claims 18-20 *; | [Y]US2011254379 (MADAWALA UDAYA KUMARA [NZ]) [Y] 8,10,15 * paragraph [0100]; figure 8; claims 3,4 * | International search | [X]WO9908359 (MEINS JURGEN G [DE], et al); | [Y]WO2011016736 (AUCKLAND UNISERVICES LTD [NZ], et al); | [X]WO2011050960 (BOMBARDIER TRANSP GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]WO2012005607 (AUCKLAND UNISERVICES LTD [NZ], et al); | [Y] - MADAWALA, U. K. ET AL., "A Bidirectional Inductive Power Interface for Electric Vehicles in V2G Systems", IEEE TRANS. IN INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, (201110), vol. 58, no. 10, pages 4789 - 4796, XP011383178 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIE.2011.2114312 | by applicant | WO2010062198 |