EP2890610 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF BALLAST WATER TREATMENT WITH CONTINUOUS BIOFOULING CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sembcorp Marine Repairs & Upgrades Pte. Ltd. Admiralty Road West Singapore 759956 / SG | [2015/52] |
Former [2015/28] | For all designated states Sembawang Shipyard Pte Ltd Admiralty Road West Singapore 759956 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUIK, Sow Hong 54 Springleaf Garden Singapore 788211 / SG | 02 /
CHEW, Tee Tank 53 Lentor Crescent Singapore 786720 / SG | 03 /
CHEW, Hwee Hong No. 1 Holt Road 11-08 Singapore 129441 / SG | 04 /
CHUA, Chee Yong 76 Siang Kuang Avenue Singapore 347985 / SG | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/02] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2015/28] | Merryweather, Colin Henry J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13834205.0 | 28.08.2013 | [2020/02] | WO2013SG00376 | Priority number, date | SG20120006460 | 30.08.2012 Original published format: SG 201206460 | [2015/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014035343 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2890610 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2890610 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B63J4/00, C02F1/30, C02F1/34, C02F1/32, C02F1/48 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
B63J4/002 (EP,US);
C02F1/32 (US);
C02F1/325 (EP,US);
C02F1/487 (EP,US);
C02F1/001 (EP,US);
C02F1/38 (EP,US);
C02F2103/008 (EP,US);
C02F2201/3222 (EP,US);
C02F2303/04 (US);
Y02T70/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/28] | B63J4/00, C02F1/30, C02F1/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BALLASTWASSERBEHANDLUNG MIT KONTINUIERLICHER BIOBEWUCHSKONTROLLE | [2015/28] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF BALLAST WATER TREATMENT WITH CONTINUOUS BIOFOULING CONTROL | [2015/28] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'EAU DE BALLAST À RÉGULATION CONTINUE D'ENCRASSEMENT BIOLOGIQUE | [2015/28] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 24.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2013 | AL | 08.01.2020 | AT | 08.01.2020 | CY | 08.01.2020 | CZ | 08.01.2020 | EE | 08.01.2020 | ES | 08.01.2020 | FI | 08.01.2020 | HR | 08.01.2020 | IT | 08.01.2020 | LT | 08.01.2020 | LV | 08.01.2020 | MC | 08.01.2020 | MK | 08.01.2020 | MT | 08.01.2020 | PL | 08.01.2020 | RO | 08.01.2020 | RS | 08.01.2020 | SE | 08.01.2020 | SI | 08.01.2020 | SK | 08.01.2020 | SM | 08.01.2020 | TR | 08.01.2020 | BG | 08.04.2020 | IS | 08.05.2020 | PT | 31.05.2020 | IE | 28.08.2020 | LU | 28.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
AL | 08.01.2020 | ||
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 28.08.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 28.08.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 28.08.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 28.08.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | ES | 08.01.2020 | |
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005155539 (RANDALL PETER [US]) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0021] , [0023] , [0028] * [I] 1-20; | [XI]WO2007117634 (FORET PLASMA LABS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,9,11,19 * page 1, line 11 * * page 3, line 4 * * page 6, line 15 * * page 15, line 18 * * page 3, line 26 - line 28 * [I] 1-20; | [A]US2008190826 (MINER JEFFERY G [US], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]DE102009054387 (AQUAWORX HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [XI] - MATTHEW GREGG ET AL, "Review of two decades of progress in the development of management options for reducing or eradicating phytoplankton, zooplankton and bacteria in ship's ballast water", AQUATIC INVASIONS, (20090901), vol. 4, no. 3, doi:10.3391/ai.2009.4.3.14, pages 521 - 565, XP055262220 [X] 1,11 * page 550; table 9 * [I] 1-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3391/ai.2009.4.3.14 | International search | [A]WO0078678 (AMWAY CORP [US], et al); | [A]WO2011064260 (AQUAWORX HOLDING AG [CH], et al); | [A]CN202297290U (ELITE MARINE BALLAST WATER TREAT SYSTEM CORP) | Examination | WO2004071863 | WO2011029222 | EP2412627 |