EP2893507 - CLINICAL DECISION SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRIES, Sebastian Peter Michael c/o Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SABCZYNSKI, Jörg c/o Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
DADLANI MAHTANI, Pavankumar Murli c/o Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
ALEKSOVSKI, Zarko c/o Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | Müller, Frank Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 13834562.4 | 10.09.2013 | WO2013IB58418 | Priority number, date | EP20120183654 | 10.09.2012 Original published format: EP 12183654 | US201261699419P | 11.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261699419 P | [2015/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014037922 | Date: | 13.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2893507 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
A61B10/00 (RU);
G06N5/022 (EP,US);
G06N5/045 (EP,US);
G06Q50/22 (RU);
G16H70/20 (EP,US);
G16H70/60 (EP,US);
G16H80/00 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G16H15/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/29] | G06Q50/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Title | German: | UNTERSTÜTZUNG FÜR KLINISCHE ENTSCHEIDUNGSFINDUNG | [2015/29] | English: | CLINICAL DECISION SUPPORT | [2015/29] | French: | AIDE À LA DÉCISION CLINIQUE | [2015/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 05.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002184050 (PAPAGEORGE BASIL [US]); | [A]US2007001011 (SELINFREUND RICHARD H [US], et al); | [Y]US2009099872 (GORDON TIM H [US], et al); | [Y]US2010211402 (EGGENA TIMOTHY [US], et al); | [Y]WO2012085719 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) |