EP2893901 - DENTAL IMPLANT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisya Advance 5-7 Nihonbashi Kobunacho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8354 / JP | [2015/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URAKABE, Nobuchika c/o KABUSHIKI KAISYA ADVANCE 5-7 Nihonbashi Kobunacho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8354 / JP | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 13834583.0 | 06.09.2013 | WO2013JP74122 | Priority number, date | JP20120197936 | 07.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012197936 | [2015/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014038669 | Date: | 13.03.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2893901 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00, A61L27/00 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
A61C8/0015 (EP,US);
A61C8/0013 (US);
A61C13/0006 (US);
A61C8/0022 (EP,US);
A61C8/0048 (EP,US);
A61L27/32 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Title | German: | ZAHNIMPLANTAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2015/29] | English: | DENTAL IMPLANT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2015/29] | French: | IMPLANT DENTAIRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2015/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2015 | Translation filed | 07.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 16.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/35] | 13.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009280156 (HOTOKEBUCHI TAKAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0017] , [0 20] , [0 22] , [0 25] , [0 35]; example -; claim - *; | [A] - T. AOBA, "The effect of fluoride on apatite structure and growth", CRIT. REV. ORAL BIOL. MED, (1997), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 136 - 153, XP002756949 [A] 1-13 * page 139, column LEFT * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/10454411970080020301 | International search | [A]JPS6399867 (PERMELEC ELECTRODE LTD [JP]); | [A]JPH04371146 (ADVANCE CO LTD); | [Y]JPH09253191 (BUREEN BEESU KK); | [A]JPH1147259 (SULZER CALCITEK INC); | [X]JP2007143772 (ADVANCE CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH02161939 | JPH04371146 | JPH0999053 | JP2005270529 | JP2007143772 | - J. CERAM. SOC. JAPAN, (1999), vol. 107, no. 10, pages 907 - 912 |