EP2893478 - USING HAPLOTYPES TO INFER ANCESTRAL ORIGINS FOR RECENTLY ADMIXED INDIVIDUALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ancestry.com DNA, LLC 360 W. 4800 N Provo, Utah 84604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | For all designated states Ancestry.com DNA LLC 360 W 4800 N Provo, Utah 84604 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOTO, Keith D. Ancestry.com DNA LLC 360 W 4800 N Provo, Utah 84604 / US | 02 /
BYRNES, Jake K. Ancestry.com DNA LLC 360 W 4800 N Provo, Utah 84604 / US | 03 /
BALL, Catherine A. Ancestry.com DNA LLC 360 W 4800 N Provo, Utah 84604 / US | 04 /
CHAHINE, Kenneth G. Ancestry.com DNA LLC 360 W 4800 N Provo, Utah 84604 / US | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 13834692.9 | 06.09.2013 | WO2013US58588 | Priority number, date | US201261697757P | 06.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261697757 P | [2015/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014039875 | Date: | 13.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2893478 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
G16B5/00 (EP,US);
G16B20/00 (EP,US);
G16B20/20 (EP,US);
G16B20/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON HAPLOTYPEN ZUR ABLEITUNG DER ABSTAMMUNG VON VOR KURZEM VERMISCHTEN PERSONEN | [2015/29] | English: | USING HAPLOTYPES TO INFER ANCESTRAL ORIGINS FOR RECENTLY ADMIXED INDIVIDUALS | [2015/29] | French: | UTILISATION D'HAPLOTYPES POUR DÉDUIRE DES ORIGINES ANCESTRALES D'INDIVIDUS RÉCEMMENT MÉLANGÉS | [2015/29] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 24.06.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004016768 (DNAPRINT GENOMICS INC [US], et al); | [A]US2005074806 (SKIERCZYNSKI BOGUSLAW A [US], et al); | [X]US2009099789 (STEPHAN DIETRICH A [US], et al); | [A]US2011105353 (LO YUK MING DENNIS [HK], et al); | [A]US2012107315 (BEHRENS TIMOTHY W [US], et al) |