EP2893639 - TEST SOLUTION FOR RING OSCILLATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silicon Image, Inc. 1140 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2015/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUL, Chinsong c/o Silicon Image, Inc. 1140 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | 02 /
KWON, Hyukyong c/o Silicon Image, Inc. 1140 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | 03 /
NG, Andy c/o Silicon Image, Inc. 1140 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 13835091.3 | 15.08.2013 | WO2013US55176 | Priority number, date | US201213605708 | 06.09.2012 Original published format: US201213605708 | [2015/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014039226 | Date: | 13.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2893639 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H03K3/03, G01R31/28, G01R31/317 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
H03K3/0315 (EP,CN,US);
G01R31/2884 (EP,US);
G01R31/318502 (EP,US);
G01R31/31709 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/29] | H03K3/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Title | German: | TESTLÖSUNG FÜR RINGOSZILLATOREN | [2015/29] | English: | TEST SOLUTION FOR RING OSCILLATORS | [2015/29] | French: | SOLUTION DE TEST POUR OSCILLATEURS EN ANNEAU | [2015/29] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 07.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2005134394 (LIU JONATHAN H [US]) [X] 15 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0094]; figures 4D, 4E * [Y] 3,4,7,10,11,14 [I] 1,2,5,6,8,9,12,13; | [Y]US2009309667 (KIM JONGHAE [US], et al) [Y] 3,10,14 * figures 4,5 *; | [Y]US5963104 (BUER MARK LEONARD [US]) [Y] 4,7,11 * figures 2,5A *; | [A]US2006220753 (BOERSTLER DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1394943 (NEC ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2010106757 (MATTHEWS JR DONALD PRESTON [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 4 *; | [A]US6069849 (KINGSLEY CHRISTOPHER H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2011163818 (DICHTL MARKUS [DE], et al); | [A]US2011090015 (SUMITA MASAYA [JP], et al); | [A]US2008048790 (BANG DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US2011219277 (JEN FREDERICK C [US], et al); | [A]JP2009163539 (TOSHIBA CORP) |