EP2893881 - ULTRASOUND UNIT AND ULTRASOUND ENDOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2015/29] | For all designated states OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIOTANI, Koichi c/o Olympus Corporation 2951, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
MIYAHARA, Hideharu c/o Olympus Corporation 2951, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 03 /
MATSUMOTO, Kazuya c/o Olympus Corporation 2951, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | 01 /
SHIOTANI, Koichi c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | ||
02 /
MIYAHARA, Hideharu c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUMOTO, Kazuya c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | |||
Former [2015/29] | 01 /
SHIOTANI, Koichi c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
MIYAHARA, Hideharu c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUMOTO, Kazuya c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13835242.2 | 17.04.2013 | WO2013JP61387 | Priority number, date | JP20120197407 | 07.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012197407 | [2015/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014038238 | Date: | 13.03.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2893881 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/12, H04R19/00 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
A61B8/12 (EP,CN,US);
A61B8/4444 (US);
A61B8/445 (EP,CN,US);
A61B8/4483 (EP,US);
A61B8/4494 (CN);
A61B8/54 (US);
B06B1/0292 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLEINHEIT UND ULTRASCHALLENDOSKOP | [2015/29] | English: | ULTRASOUND UNIT AND ULTRASOUND ENDOSCOPE | [2015/29] | French: | UNITÉ À ULTRASONS ET ENDOSCOPE À ULTRASONS | [2015/29] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2015 | Translation filed | 18.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 09.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/16] | 03.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1911529 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP2168493 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP1932479 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0022] , [0079]; claim 1 * | International search | [A]JP2009055473 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP.); | [A]JP2009050560 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP.); | [A]JP2008118631 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP.); | [A]JP2008093214 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP.); | [A]JP2008099036 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP.) | by applicant | JP2006050314 |