EP2892561 - HIV VACCINE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baylor Research Institute 3310 Live Oak Street, Suite 501 Dallas, TX 75204 / US | For all designated states Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states Agence Nationale De Recherches Sur Le Sida Et Les Hepatitis 101 rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | [2015/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVY, Yves 7, Rue Royer Collard 75005 Paris / FR | 02 /
ZURAWSKI, Gerard 7620 Jordan Lane Midlothian, TX 76065 / US | 03 /
FLAMAR, Anne-laure 8650 Southwestern Blvd, 4015 Dallas, TX 75206 / US | 04 /
ZURAWSKI, Sandra 7620 Jordan Lane Midlothian, TX 76065 / US | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2015/29] | Application number, filing date | 13835251.3 | 06.09.2013 | WO2013US58539 | Priority number, date | US201261698432P | 07.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261698432 P | [2015/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014039840 | Date: | 13.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2892561 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P31/18, A61P31/00 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
C07K16/28 (EP);
C07K16/2851 (EP);
C07K16/2878 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP);
A61K2039/55555 (EP);
A61K2039/55561 (EP);
A61K2039/6056 (EP);
A61K2039/62 (EP);
C07K2319/33 (EP);
C12N2740/16134 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HIV-IMPFSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2015/29] | English: | HIV VACCINE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS | [2015/29] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE VACCIN CONTRE LE VIH ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2015/29] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 26.10.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2010135994 (BANCHEREAU JACQUES F [US], et al); | [Y]US2008267984 (BANCHEREAU JACQUES F [US], et al); | [A]US2008241134 (KOBAYASHI YUKO [JP], et al); | [A]US2009311271 (HARNISH DOUGLAS CARL [US], et al); | [A]US2012087926 (MATSUDA HARUO [JP], et al) |