EP2896009 - GENERATING A SCORE FOR A COUPON CAMPAIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 14.10.2020 [2020/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quotient Technology Inc. 400 Logue Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2016/27] |
Former [2015/30] | For all designated states Coupons.com Incorporated 400 Logue Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THAMPY, Sajjit c/o Coupons.com Incorporated 400 Logue Avenue Mountain View, CO 94043 / US | 02 /
PATEL, Kavel c/o Coupons.com Incorporated 400 Logue Avenue Mountain View, CO 94043 / US | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2015/30] | Application number, filing date | 13836855.0 | 12.09.2013 | WO2013US59505 | Priority number, date | US201213612848 | 13.09.2012 Original published format: US201213612848 | [2015/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014043379 | Date: | 20.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2896009 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06Q30/06 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0631 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/30] | G06Q30/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG EINES PUNKTESYSTEMS FÜR EINE COUPONKAMPAGNE | [2015/30] | English: | GENERATING A SCORE FOR A COUPON CAMPAIGN | [2015/30] | French: | GÉNÉRATION D'UN SCORE POUR UNE CAMPAGNE PAR COUPONS | [2015/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 31.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.05.2020 | 11.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.05.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/42] | 05.06.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008243638 (CHAN JAMES D [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0025] , [ 0034] - [0052] *; | [A]KR20120087202 (SK PLANET CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0009] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0043] * | International search | [X]US2009138365 (MUELLER RAYMOND J [US], et al); | [Y]EP2463818 (DIGITAL FOODIE OY [FI]); | [A]US2012123844 (FANO ANDREW E [US], et al); | [A]KR101168075B (BCCARD CO., LTD.); | [A]KR20090000643 (NAM JONG CHUL [KR]) | by applicant | US2008243638 |