EP2896149 - DATA STREAM DIVISION TO INCREASE DATA TRANSMISSION RATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states First Principles, Inc. 455 New Karner Road Albany, New York 12205 / US | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANIERE, Keith, A. 455 New Karner Road Albany, NY 12205 / US | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 13836962.4 | 13.09.2013 | WO2013US59661 | Priority number, date | US201213613230 | 13.09.2012 Original published format: US201213613230 | [2015/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014043469 | Date: | 20.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2896149 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/16, H04W28/06, // H04W88/06 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
H04W28/065 (EP,US);
H04L43/0888 (RU,US);
H04L47/626 (US);
H04L45/24 (EP,RU,US);
H04L47/6275 (US);
H04L63/18 (EP,US);
H04W28/18 (EP,US);
H04W48/18 (US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04L2001/0096 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/30] | H04J3/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Title | German: | DATENSTROMUNTERTEILUNG ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSRATEN | [2015/30] | English: | DATA STREAM DIVISION TO INCREASE DATA TRANSMISSION RATES | [2015/30] | French: | DIVISION DE FLUX DE DONNÉES POUR AUGMENTER LES DÉBITS DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES | [2015/30] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 28.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/47] | 15.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US7725587 (JACOBY BRIAN [US], et al); | [X]US2010154044 (MANKU TAJINDER [CA]); | [X]US2011213827 (KASPAR DOMINIK [NO], et al); | [X]US2012196579 (SOUISSI SLIM SALAH [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US2004190444 (TRUDEL RICHARD [CA], et al); | [Y]US2006182152 (BI QI [US], et al); | [Y]WO2008097254 (EMBARQ HOLDINGS CO LLC [US], et al); | [A]US2009092137 (HAIGH RONALD E [US], et al); | [Y]US2012033673 (GOEL DEEPAK [IN]) | by applicant | US2012196579 |