EP2884428 - SCENE RECOGNITION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Yugang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Jie Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Dong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
ZHENG, Yingbin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
XUE, Xiangyang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/25] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13837155.4 | 13.09.2013 | WO2013CN83501 | Priority number, date | CN20121341511 | 14.09.2012 Original published format: CN201210341511 | [2015/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014040559 | Date: | 20.03.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2884428 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/62, G06K9/00 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
G06V20/35 (EP,US);
G06F18/253 (EP,US);
G06V10/806 (EP,US);
G06V20/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/25] | G06K9/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] | Title | German: | SZENENERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2015/25] | English: | SCENE RECOGNITION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2015/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'IDENTIFICATION DE SCÈNE | [2015/25] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2015 | Translation filed | 09.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 19.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/43] | 27.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6549660 (LIPSON PAMELA R [US], et al) [A] 5,10 * the whole document *; | [XI]EP2154630 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0064]; figures 2-14 * [I] 5,10; | [A]US2012213426 (FEI-FEI LI [US], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document * | International search | [A]CN101277394 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [X]CN101996317 (SHENZHEN INST OF ADV TECH CAS); | [X]CN102426653 (UNIV XIDIAN) |