EP2897399 - TDMA ACCESS METHOD AND DEVICE BASED ON MULTIPLE ACCESS POINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenyang Institute of Automation of the Chinese Academy of Sciences No. 114 Nanta Street Dongling District Shenyang Liaoning 110016 / CN | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIANG, Wei No.114 Nanta Street Dongling District Shenyang Liaoning 110016 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Shuai No.114 Nanta Street Dongling District Shenyang Liaoning 110016 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Xiaoling No.114 Nanta Street Dongling District Shenyang Liaoning 110016 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Yutuo No.114 Nanta Street Dongling District Shenyang Liaoning 110016 / CN | 05 /
YU, Haibin No.114 Nanta Street Dongling District Shenyang Liaoning 110016 / CN | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Kirkpatrick Avenue Wolfers, 32 1310 La Hulpe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/32] | Office Kirkpatrick Avenue Wolfers, 32 1310 La Hulpe / BE | ||
Former [2015/30] | Machtalère, Georges, et al Office Kirkpatrick S.A. Avenue Wolfers, 32 1310 La Hulpe / BE | Application number, filing date | 13837737.9 | 10.01.2013 | [2017/32] | WO2013CN70326 | Priority number, date | CN201210345480 | 17.09.2012 Original published format: CN201210345480 | [2015/30] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014040398 | Date: | 20.03.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2897399 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2897399 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/18, H04B7/26 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
H04W40/244 (EP,US);
H04J3/1694 (US);
H04B7/2656 (EP,US);
H04L5/0055 (US);
H04W16/18 (US);
H04W48/08 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/30] | H04W16/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TDMA-ZUGRIFFSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG AUF DER BASIS VON MEHREREN ZUGANGSPUNKTEN | [2015/30] | English: | TDMA ACCESS METHOD AND DEVICE BASED ON MULTIPLE ACCESS POINTS | [2015/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ACCÈS TDMA BASÉ SUR DE MULTIPLES POINTS D'ACCÈS | [2015/30] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2015 | Translation filed | 07.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 22.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2013 | AL | 09.08.2017 | AT | 09.08.2017 | CY | 09.08.2017 | CZ | 09.08.2017 | DK | 09.08.2017 | EE | 09.08.2017 | ES | 09.08.2017 | FI | 09.08.2017 | HR | 09.08.2017 | IT | 09.08.2017 | LT | 09.08.2017 | LV | 09.08.2017 | MC | 09.08.2017 | MK | 09.08.2017 | NL | 09.08.2017 | PL | 09.08.2017 | PT | 09.08.2017 | RO | 09.08.2017 | RS | 09.08.2017 | SE | 09.08.2017 | SI | 09.08.2017 | SK | 09.08.2017 | SM | 09.08.2017 | TR | 09.08.2017 | BG | 09.11.2017 | NO | 09.11.2017 | GR | 10.11.2017 | IS | 09.12.2017 | IE | 10.01.2018 | LU | 10.01.2018 | MT | 10.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 10.01.2013 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MK | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 10.01.2013 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 10.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 10.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 09.08.2017 | |
NO | 09.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007171818 (SHOJI YOZO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0009] - [0016] *; | [A]US2007195740 (BHUSHAN NAGA [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] *; | [A]WO2007103794 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-39 *; | [A]WO2009116682 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-23 * | International search | [A]CN101500314 (UNIV SOUTHWEST [CN]); | [A]CN101651969 (UNIV XI AN JIAOTONG); | [A]CN102118849 (UNIV CHONGQING POSTS & TELECOM); | [A]CN102340819 (SHENZHEN INST OF ADV TECH CAS); | [A]CN102404855 (SHANGHAI INST PROCESS AUTOMATION INSTRUMENTATION); | [A]CN102413581 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) |