EP2899536 - PINHOLE INSPECTION DEVICE FOR CAN BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Seikan Group Holdings, Ltd. 18-1, Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8627 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | For all designated states Toyo Seikan Group Holdings, Ltd. 18-1, Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 1418627 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOUJI Yasuhiro c/o Toyo Seikan Co. Ltd. Technology&Packaging Development Division 1-1-70 Yako, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0001 / JP | 02 /
SEO Tomoki c/o Toyo Seikan Co. Ltd. Sendai Plant 2-4-1 Minato Miyagino-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 983-0001 / JP | 03 /
ISHII Yuuma c/o Toyo Seikan Co. Ltd. Ibaraki Plant 1-81 Higashiunobecho Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0879 / JP | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 13838187.6 | 05.09.2013 | WO2013JP73981 | Priority number, date | JP20120204574 | 18.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012204574 | [2015/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014045890 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2899536 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/90, G01N21/894 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
G01N21/894 (EP,US);
G01N21/90 (US);
G01M3/38 (EP,US);
G01N21/909 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | G01N21/90 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Title | German: | NADELLOCHINSPEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DOSENKÖRPER | [2015/31] | English: | PINHOLE INSPECTION DEVICE FOR CAN BODY | [2015/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INSPECTION DE TROU D'ÉPINGLE POUR CORPS DE BOÎTE | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2015 | Translation filed | 02.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 02.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 28.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4455225 (MORIMOTO KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1 - column 3 ** column 5 - column 6 *; | [I]JP2004317356 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS TECHNO CO) [I] 1-7 * abstract *; | [E]EP2866023 (TOYO SEIKAN GROUP HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) [E] 1 * abstract * * page 5 - page 8 * | International search | [A]JPS577545 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD); | [A]JPH06109661 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD); | [A]JP2002365230 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK); | [A]JP2003075360 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD); | [A]JP2004317356 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS TECHNO CO); | [A]JP2009025131 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS TECHNO CO) | by applicant | JP2002365230 | JP4230269B | JP4715988B |