EP2897826 - AIR FILTRATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A HVAC UNIT IN A TRANSPORT COMPARTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermo King Corporation 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis, MN 55420 / US | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOREJT, Lubos Zelena 433 CZ-253 01 Statenice / CZ | 02 /
CERMAK, Radim Mezi Skolami 2321/2 CZ-158 00 Prague / CZ | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13838862.4 | 20.09.2013 | WO2013US60931 | Priority number, date | US201261703551P | 20.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261703551 P | [2015/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014047445 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2897826 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B03C3/12, B03C3/155, B60H3/00, B60H3/06, // B01D46/52, A61L9/22 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
B60H3/06 (EP,CN,US);
B60H3/0071 (EP,CN,US);
B60H3/0658 (US);
B03C3/011 (EP,CN,US);
B03C3/025 (EP,US);
B03C3/09 (EP,CN,US);
B03C3/12 (EP,CN,US);
B03C3/155 (EP,CN,US);
B03C3/41 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | B60H3/06, A61L9/22, B01D46/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Title | German: | LUFTFILTERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE KLIMAANLAGE IN EINEM TRANSPORTRAUM | [2015/31] | English: | AIR FILTRATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A HVAC UNIT IN A TRANSPORT COMPARTMENT | [2015/31] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FILTRATION D'AIR POUR UNITÉ HVAC DANS UN COMPARTIMENT DE TRANSPORT | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 02.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/16] | 15.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.11.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5290343 (MORITA KEIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 5,10,13* column 4, line 15 - line 45; figure 8 *; | [IY]US6576046 (PRUETTE DEAN B [US], et al) [I] 1-4,6-9,11,12 * columns 4,5; figures 1,2,3,5,8 * * the whole document * [Y] 5,10,13; | [Y]US2009025402 (MELLO PETER J [US], et al) [Y] 5,10,13 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0072]; figures 12,13 * * paragraph [0068] * | International search | [Y]US5330559 (CHENEY WILLIAM A [US], et al); | [Y]US6576046 (PRUETTE DEAN B [US], et al); | [Y]JP3440403B (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.); | [A]US2004118285 (KIM YOUNG-SAENG [KR], et al); | [Y]KR100688945B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO. LTD.) |