EP2899982 - INTRA PREDICTION BASED ON INTERPOLATED REFERENCE SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/31] | VIDEO PREDICTION ENCODING DEVICE, VIDEO PREDICTION ENCODING METHOD, VIDEO PREDICTION DECODING DEVICE AND VIDEO PREDICTION DECODING METHOD | ||
[2017/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT Docomo, Inc. 11-1 Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI Yoshinori c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
BOON Choong Seng c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
TAN Thiow Keng c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2017/31] |
Former [2015/31] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 13839473.9 | 17.06.2013 | [2017/31] | WO2013JP66616 | Priority number, date | JP20120209626 | 24.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012209626 | [2015/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014045651 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2899982 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2899982 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/50, H04N19/136, H04N19/176, H04N19/593, H04N19/117, H04N19/82, H04N19/86, H04N19/59 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
H04N19/59 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/52 (BR,US);
H04N19/117 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06T9/00 (RU);
H04N19/105 (KR);
H04N19/136 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/159 (US);
H04N19/50 (KR);
H04N19/521 (BR,US);
H04N19/573 (BR);
H04N19/587 (BR);
H04N19/593 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/625 (US);
H04N19/80 (KR);
H04N19/82 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/86 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | H04N19/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTRA-PRÄDIKTION BASIEREND AUF INTERPOLIERTEN REFERENZBILDPUNKTEN | [2017/20] | English: | INTRA PREDICTION BASED ON INTERPOLATED REFERENCE SAMPLES | [2017/20] | French: | INTRA PRÉDICTION BASÉE SUR DES ÉCHANTILLONS DE RÉFÉRENCE INTERPOLÉS | [2017/20] |
Former [2015/31] | VIDEOPRÄDIKTIONSCODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VIDEOPRÄDIKTIONSCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, VIDEOPRÄDIKTIONSDECODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VIDEOPRÄDIKTIONSDECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2015/31] | VIDEO PREDICTION ENCODING DEVICE, VIDEO PREDICTION ENCODING METHOD, VIDEO PREDICTION DECODING DEVICE AND VIDEO PREDICTION DECODING METHOD | ||
Former [2015/31] | DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE DE PRÉDICTION VIDÉO, PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE DE PRÉDICTION VIDÉO, DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE DE PRÉDICTION VIDÉO ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE DE PRÉDICTION VIDÉO | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2015 | Translation filed | 14.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 15.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17152385.5 / EP3179722 | EP19218030.5 / EP3654650 | EP23162588.0 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2013 | AL | 02.08.2017 | AT | 02.08.2017 | CY | 02.08.2017 | DK | 02.08.2017 | EE | 02.08.2017 | FI | 02.08.2017 | HR | 02.08.2017 | LT | 02.08.2017 | LV | 02.08.2017 | MC | 02.08.2017 | MK | 02.08.2017 | RS | 02.08.2017 | SI | 02.08.2017 | SM | 02.08.2017 | BG | 02.11.2017 | GR | 03.11.2017 | IS | 02.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.06.2013 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CY | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MK | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 17.06.2013 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 02.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2712192 (KT CORP [KR]) [E] 1-6 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0146]; figures 12,13 *; | [X] - DAVIES (BBC) T ET AL, "Suggestion for a Test Model", 1. JCT-VC MEETING; 15-4-2010 - 23-4-2010; DRESDEN; (JOINTCOLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-TSG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20100507), ISSN 0000-0049, XP030007526 [X] 1,3,5,6 * page 12, paragraph 4.3 - page 13 * | [XP] - TAN T K ET AL, "Contouring artefact and solution", 11. JCT-VC MEETING; 102. MPEG MEETING; 10-10-2012 - 19-10-2012; SHANGHAI; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20121001), no. JCTVC-K0139, XP030113021 [XP] 1-6 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2012077719 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [X] - VIKTOR WAHADANIAH ET AL., "Constrained Intra Prediction Scheme for Flexible-Sized Prediction Units in HEVC", JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING (JCT-VC) OF ITU-T SG16 WP3 AND ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 JCTVC-D094, ITU-T, (20110121), pages 1 - 8, XP030008134 | [A] - JIE ZHAO ET AL., "On Intra Coding and MDIS", JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING (JCT-VC) OF ITU-T SG16 WP3 AND ISO/IEC JTC1/ SC29/WG11 JCTVC-E437, ITU-T, (20110316), pages 1 - 4, XP030008943 | by applicant | US6765964 | US7003035 |