EP2899923 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING ETHERNET DATA TRANSMISSION RATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Wei ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
GUO, Dandan ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
TANG, Xiong ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
YU, Jinqing ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
TU, Hui ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Carangelo, Pierluigi Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Tomacelli 146 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Carangelo, Pierluigi Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via delle Quattro Fontane, 15 00184 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 13839539.7 | 18.09.2013 | WO2013CN83771 | Priority number, date | CN201210351613 | 20.09.2012 Original published format: CN201210351613 | [2015/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014044190 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2899923 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L25/14, H04L12/825, H04L1/00, H04L12/26 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
H04L47/25 (EP,US);
H04L1/0002 (EP,US);
H04L25/14 (EP,US);
H04L43/00 (EP,US);
H04L43/10 (US);
Y02D30/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER ETHERNET-DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSRATE | [2015/31] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING ETHERNET DATA TRANSMISSION RATE | [2015/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'AJUSTEMENT DE DÉBIT DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES ETHERNET | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2015 | Translation filed | 09.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 01.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.06.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US7525992 (SHACHAL YARON [IL]) [X] 1-3,8-10 * column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 45; figures 1,2 * [I] 4-7,11-13; | [XI]US2010329112 (AHN KYE-HYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-6,8-13 * abstract * * page 2, column l, paragraph 30 - page 3, column l, paragraph 61; figures 1-4 * [I] 7; | [A] - ANDREW DECZKY CATENA NETWORKS CANADA ET AL, "ATM Specific Bonding Standard Framework.; D 792", ITU-T DRAFT STUDY PERIOD 2001-2004, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20031021), vol. STUDY GROUP 15, pages 1 - 14, XP017417524 [A] 1-13 * page 3, sections 2.2.1, 2.2.2 and 2.2.3;; figure 2 * * page 4, section 2.4.1 - page 5, section 2.4.2;; figures 5,6 * * page 11, section 2.5.8 * | International search | [A]CN101034967 (SHENZHEN DVISION TECHNOLOGY CO [CN]); | [A]TW200803299 (TERANETICS INC [US]); | [X]CN102238034 (RUIJIE NETWORKS CO LTD) |