EP2889581 - NAVIGATION TERMINAL, NAVIGATION METHOD AND REMOTE NAVIGATION SERVICE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Device Co., Ltd. Building B2 Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Zhu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Zhiyong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
TU, Yongfeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 13839553.8 | 17.09.2013 | WO2013CN83673 | Priority number, date | CN20121351868 | 20.09.2012 Original published format: CN201210351868 | [2015/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014044173 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2889581 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/26, G01C21/34, G01C21/36 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
G01C21/34 (EP,US);
G01S19/38 (US);
B60R1/24 (EP,US);
G01C21/265 (US);
G01C21/3492 (EP,US);
G01C21/3605 (US);
G01C21/3629 (US);
G01C21/3632 (US);
G01C21/3647 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/27] | G01C21/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Title | German: | NAVIGATIONSENDGERÄT, NAVIGATIONSVERFAHREN UND ENTFERNTES NAVIGATIONSDIENSTSYSTEM | [2015/27] | English: | NAVIGATION TERMINAL, NAVIGATION METHOD AND REMOTE NAVIGATION SERVICE SYSTEM | [2015/27] | French: | TERMINAL DE NAVIGATION, PROCÉDÉ DE NAVIGATION ET SYSTÈME DE SERVICE DE NAVIGATION À DISTANCE | [2015/27] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2015 | Translation filed | 23.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 20.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/23] | 26.04.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.06.2017 | 08.06.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2001056325 (PU QING KENT [US], et al) [X] 1,5,8,12 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0015] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0042] - [0074]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2,3,6,7,9,10 [I] 4,11; | [YA]US2009125234 (GEELEN PIETER [NL], et al) [Y] 2,3,6,7,9,10 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraphs [0010] - [0014] - [0017] , [0071] *[A] 4,11 | International search | [X]CN1759300 (NAVITIME JAPAN CO LTD [JP]); | [X]CN101782395 (ZTE CORP); | [X]CN102062607 (SICHUAN CHANGHONG ELECTRIC CO); | [XP]CN102879000 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD) |