EP2898517 - RADIO FREQUENCY TRANSFORMER WINDING COIL STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPC Broadband Inc. 6176 East Molloy Road East Syracuse, NY 13057 / US | For all designated states Marketos, Leon 16 2nd Avenue Auburn, NY 13021 / US | For all designated states Alkan, Erdogan 5100 Highbridge Street Apartment 28E Fayetteville, NY 13066 / US | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARKETOS, Leon 16 2nd Avenue Auburn, NY 13021 / US | 02 /
ALKAN, Erdogan 5100 Highbridge Street Apartment 28E Fayetteville, NY 13066 / US | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Bittner, Thomas L. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Bittner, Thomas L. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13840038.7 | 20.09.2013 | WO2013US60846 | Priority number, date | US201261703802P | 21.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261703802 P | US201313948315 | 23.07.2013 Original published format: US201313948315 | [2015/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014047400 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2898517 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01F19/06, H01F27/28, H01F41/08 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
H01F27/255 (EP,US);
H01F27/006 (US);
H01F27/2895 (EP,US);
H01F41/0206 (US);
H01F41/06 (US);
H01F41/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | H01F19/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Title | German: | WINDUNGSSPULENSTRUKTUR FÜR EINEN FUNKFREQUENZTRANSFORMATOR | [2015/31] | English: | RADIO FREQUENCY TRANSFORMER WINDING COIL STRUCTURE | [2015/31] | French: | STRUCTURE DE BOBINE À ENROULEMENT DE TRANSFORMATEUR DE RADIOFRÉQUENCES | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 23.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0475522 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-6,12 * abstract * * column 2, line 14 - column 4, line 1; figures 1,4,5; claim 1 * [I] 7-11,13; | [XI]EP0499311 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-6,12 * abstract * * figure 7; claim 1 * [I] 7-11,13; | [A]US2005162237 (YAMASHITA AKIHIRO [JP]) [A] 13* paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052]; figure 7; claim 17 * | International search | [A]US4551700 (WALDEMAR ANDERS [SE]); | [A]US5390349 (JOSHI SHANKAR R [US], et al); | [A]US5473300 (WATSON MICHAEL B [GB]); | [A]US2003030534 (GU WENJIAN [US], et al); | [A]US2005146326 (LI XIAOPING [SG]); | [A] - PARK, J ET AL., "Ferrite-Based Integrated Planar Inductors and Transformers", IEEE TRANS. MAGNETICS, vol. 33, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9464, (199709), pages 3322 - 3324, URL: http://www.mems.gatech.edu/msmawebsite_2006/publications/publication_list files/1997/Ferrite -Based%201ntegrated%20Planar%201nductors%20and%20Transformers%20Fabricated%20at%20Low%20Temperature.pdf, (20140114), XP011031711 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.617931 | [A] - PARK, J ET AL., "Ultralow-Profile Micromachined Power Inductors With Highly Laminated Ni/Fe Cores: Application to Low-Megahertz DC-DC Converters", IEEE TRANS. MAGNETICS, vol. 39, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9464, (199709), pages 3184 - 3186, URL: http://www.mems.gatech.edu/msma/publications/2003/Ultra-low-profile%20micromachined% 20power%20inductors%20with%20highly%201aminated%20NiFe%20cores%20application%20to%201ow%20MHz%20DC-DC%20converters.pdf> DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMAG.2003.816006 | by applicant | EP0475522 | EP0499311 | US2005162237 |