EP2772836 - TOUCHSCREEN AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2014/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Ji Young LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-738 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Seung Heon LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-738 / KR | 03 /
HWANG, In-Seok LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-738 / KR | [2014/36] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13840123.7 | 02.12.2013 | WO2013KR11074 | Priority number, date | KR20120138375 | 30.11.2012 Original published format: KR 20120138375 | [2014/36] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014084697 | Date: | 05.06.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2772836 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G09F9/00 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
G06F3/04164 (EP);
G06F3/041 (KR,US);
G06F1/16 (US);
G06F2203/04102 (US);
G06F2203/04103 (EP,KR,US);
G06F2203/04112 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/36] | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRM UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2014/36] | English: | TOUCHSCREEN AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2014/36] | French: | ECRAN TACTILE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2014/36] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2014 | Translation filed | 31.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 09.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/16] | 07.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/16] | 30.11.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011227846 (IMAZEKI YOSHIKATSU [JP]) [X] 1,3-13,16-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0052] * [I] 2,14,15; | [XI]US2012170283 (KOBAYASHI KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-13,17,18 * abstract * [I] 2,14-16; | [XI]US2012268402 (WANG WEN-CHUN [TW], et al) [X] 1,3-13,16-18 * abstract * [I] 2,14,15; | [I]US2012234663 (HWANG JI YOUNG [KR], et al) [I] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0165] *; | [A]US2009219258 (GEAGHAN BERNARD O [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0154] *; | [E]EP2682948 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [E] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]EP2209063 (SAMSUNG MOBILE DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 2 * abstract *; | [XI]CN102799313 (AU OPTRONICS CORP) [X] 1,3-6,8-13,16-18 * figures 1A,2A * [I] 2,14,15; | [P]US2013293508 (LIN CHENG-HSING [TW], et al) | International search | [A]KR20100084255 (SAMSUNG MOBILE DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]WO2011159107 (SAMWON ST [KR], et al); | [A]KR20120078972 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]WO2012121519 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al); | [Y]KR20120116225 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) |