EP2902612 - METHOD FOR DRIVING INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, AND AIR SUPPLY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Chemicals Corporation 1-105 Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8101 / JP | [2015/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMIZU, Atsushi 1-105 Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8101 / JP | 02 /
OHNO, Hirokazu 1-105 Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8101 / JP | 03 /
NIIHAMA, Tomohiro 1-105 Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8101 / JP | 04 /
TSUKAMOTO, Masahiro 1-105 Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8101 / JP | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | McConchie, Connor Fraser D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13840438.9 | 26.09.2013 | WO2013JP76105 | Priority number, date | JP20120217815 | 28.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012217815 | JP20130099738 | 09.05.2013 Original published format: JP 2013099738 | [2015/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014050986 | Date: | 03.04.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2902612 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F02M33/00, F02D23/00, F02D23/02, F02M25/022, F02M27/00, F02M25/032, B01D63/02, B01D63/08, B01D63/14, F02M35/10 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
F02M25/0228 (EP,US);
F02D23/02 (EP,KR,US);
B01D61/00 (EP,US);
B01D63/14 (EP,US);
F02B33/34 (EP,US);
F02B47/02 (EP,US);
F02D33/00 (KR);
F02D33/02 (KR);
F02M25/022 (KR);
F02M25/0227 (EP,US);
F02M25/025 (KR);
F02M25/03 (EP,US);
F02M25/032 (EP,US);
F02M25/035 (KR);
F02M33/00 (EP,KR,US);
F02M35/10301 (EP,US);
F02M35/10334 (EP,US);
B01D2256/10 (EP,US);
B01D2257/104 (EP,US);
B01D2317/022 (EP,US);
B01D2317/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANSTEUERUNG EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS UND LUFTZUFUHRVORRICHTUNG | [2015/32] | English: | METHOD FOR DRIVING INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, AND AIR SUPPLY DEVICE | [2015/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR ENTRAÎNER UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE ET DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN AIR | [2015/32] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2015 | Translation filed | 28.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 14.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/26] | 22.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5649517 (POOLA RAMESH B [US], et al); | [XYI]WO9942709 (COMPACT MEMBRANE SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [XYI]WO03078819 (WAERTSILAE FINLAND OY [FI], et al); | [X]JP2003343272 (MAN B & W DIESEL AS); | [XYI]WO2010137628 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP], et al); | [XYI]WO2012026472 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2003343272 (MAN B & W DIESEL AS); | [X]JP2005520965 ; | [X]JP2010096133 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]WO2010137628 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH0361658 | JPH04231670 |