EP2901444 - SYSTEM, KIT AND METHOD FOR UNIVERSAL MOUNTING OF TUNING MACHINES ON STRINGED MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hipshot Products, Inc 8248 State Route 96 Interlaken NY 14847 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Borisoff, David, Joshua 8248 State Route 96 Interlaken, NY 14847 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORISOFF, David, Joshua 8248 State Route 96 Interlaken NY 14847 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2015/32] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2022/44] |
Former [2015/32] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13840681.4 | 27.09.2013 | [2022/44] | WO2013US62434 | Priority number, date | US201261744518P | 27.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261744518 P | US201361852536P | 18.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361852536 P | [2015/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014052910 | Date: | 03.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2901444 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2901444 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G10D3/14, G10D3/12, G10D1/08 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
G10D3/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM, KIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNIVERSALMONTAGE VON STIMMUNGSMASCHINEN AUF SAITENINSTRUMENTE | [2015/32] | English: | SYSTEM, KIT AND METHOD FOR UNIVERSAL MOUNTING OF TUNING MACHINES ON STRINGED MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS | [2015/32] | French: | SYSTÈME, KIT ET MÉTHODE DE MONTAGE UNIVERSEL DE MACHINES D'ACCORDAGE SUR DES INSTRUMENTS DE MUSIQUE À CORDES | [2015/32] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 30.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2020 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.11.2022 | AT | 02.11.2022 | CZ | 02.11.2022 | DK | 02.11.2022 | EE | 02.11.2022 | ES | 02.11.2022 | FI | 02.11.2022 | HR | 02.11.2022 | IT | 02.11.2022 | LT | 02.11.2022 | LV | 02.11.2022 | MC | 02.11.2022 | NL | 02.11.2022 | PL | 02.11.2022 | RO | 02.11.2022 | RS | 02.11.2022 | SE | 02.11.2022 | SI | 02.11.2022 | SK | 02.11.2022 | SM | 02.11.2022 | NO | 02.02.2023 | GR | 03.02.2023 | IS | 02.03.2023 | PT | 02.03.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
IT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 02.11.2022 | |
NO | 02.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US516545 (J MURDOCK JR) [X] 1,3-5,7,9,10,12,14,15 * the whole document *; | [XY]US548475 (ALOIS STREICHER) [X] 1,3,4,7,9-15 * the whole document * [Y] 8; | [XY]US726706 (LANG ARTHUR [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7,9-15 * the whole document * [Y] 8; | [XY]US1409064 (JOHANNES RICHTER) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,9-11,14,15 * the whole document * [Y] 8; | [Y]DE359890 (JOHANNES RICHTER JR) [Y] 8 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE2547662 (SCHALLER HELMUT) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,10,12,14,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4515059 (SIMINOFF ROGER H [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]US5847295 (KLEPACKI DAVID A [US]) [I] 1-4,6,7,9,10,12,14,15 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102007047540 (MUESING BERND [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,10,12,14,15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5180876 (THORWARD NORA J [US]); | [A]US5429028 (FISHER IV CHARLES H [US]); | [A]US2002026864 (GOTOH TAKAO [JP]); | [A]US6365809 (STEINBERGER RICHARD NED [US]); | [A]US2007245878 (HARRIS TIMOTHY M [US]) | Examination | FR515110 |