EP2849411 - SESSION ESTABLISHMENT METHODS AND CORRESPONDING SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/12] | SESSION ESTABLISHMENT METHOD, SERVER, DEVICE, SYSTEM AND APPARATUS | ||
[2017/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2017/45] |
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13, Rainbow City Shopping Mall of China Resources No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENG, Zhiyong c/o Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, NO. 68 Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
LI, Hui c/o Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, NO. 68 Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
SHI, Xin c/o Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, NO. 68 Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 04 /
DENG, Chaofeng c/o Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, NO. 68 Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25-26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/45] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | ||
Former [2015/12] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 13840739.0 | 24.09.2013 | [2017/45] | WO2013CN84116 | Priority number, date | CN201210362545 | 25.09.2012 Original published format: CN201210362545 | [2015/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014048305 | Date: | 03.04.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2849411 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2849411 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L29/06, H04L12/18 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
H04L63/104 (EP,RU,US);
H04L12/1818 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H04L67/141 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H04L51/04 (KR,RU,US);
H04L51/10 (KR);
H04L51/222 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2015/23] | H04L29/08, H04L29/06, H04L12/58 | ||
Former IPC [2015/12] | H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SITZUNGSEINRICHTUNGSVERFAHREN UND SERVER | [2017/21] | English: | SESSION ESTABLISHMENT METHODS AND CORRESPONDING SERVER | [2017/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SERVEUR POUR L'ÉTABLISSEMENT D'UNE SESSION | [2017/21] |
Former [2015/12] | SITZUNGSEINRICHTUNGSVERFAHREN, SERVER, VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2015/12] | SESSION ESTABLISHMENT METHOD, SERVER, DEVICE, SYSTEM AND APPARATUS | ||
Former [2015/12] | PROCÉDÉ, SERVEUR, DISPOSITIF, SYSTÈME ET APPAREIL POUR L'ÉTABLISSEMENT D'UNE SESSION | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2014 | Translation filed | 09.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 13.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2013 | AL | 08.11.2017 | AT | 08.11.2017 | CY | 08.11.2017 | CZ | 08.11.2017 | DK | 08.11.2017 | EE | 08.11.2017 | ES | 08.11.2017 | FI | 08.11.2017 | HR | 08.11.2017 | IT | 08.11.2017 | LT | 08.11.2017 | LV | 08.11.2017 | MC | 08.11.2017 | MK | 08.11.2017 | NL | 08.11.2017 | PL | 08.11.2017 | PT | 08.11.2017 | RO | 08.11.2017 | RS | 08.11.2017 | SE | 08.11.2017 | SI | 08.11.2017 | SK | 08.11.2017 | SM | 08.11.2017 | TR | 08.11.2017 | BG | 08.02.2018 | NO | 08.02.2018 | GR | 09.02.2018 | IS | 08.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 24.09.2013 | |
AT | 08.11.2017 | ||
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
MK | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 24.09.2013 | |
AT | 08.11.2017 | ||
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 08.11.2017 | |
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006282538 (ANGLIN HOWARD N [US], et al) [Y] 1-13,15* paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035]; figure 2 *; | [I]WO2009071388 (SCHMIDT HORST [AT], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 21 * * page 15 * * page 19 * * page 25 - page 28 * * figures 2-6 *; | [XY] - TopWebsites, "Random Stranger Chats!!", (20091025), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=pICrETcac-Q, (20150417), XP054975822 [X] 14 * 22s - 40s of the video * [Y] 1-13,15 | [XY] - Anonymous, "Omegle: Talk to strangers!", (20120915), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20120915064403/http://www.omegle.com/, (20150416), XP055183529 [X] 14 * page 1 * [Y] 1-13,15 | [XY] - Anonymous, "Chat with random strangers - StrangerMeetup.com.", (20120614), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20120614062420/http://strangermeetup.com/, (20150416), XP055183533 [X] 14 * page 1 * [Y] 1-13,15 | International search | [X]CN101645933 (KOTA ENTPR LLC US); | [A]WO2012035149 (CONNECTED ZINKING S L [ES], et al); | [A]CN101309514B (ZTE CORP); | [XP]CN102904936 (BEIJING XIAOMI TECHNOLOGY CO) |