EP2900305 - LID CONSTRUCTION FOR BREATHING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki, Auckland 2013 / NZ | [2015/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Jeremy, Livingston C/O Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki, Auckland 2013 / NZ | 02 /
KAT, Arjen, David C/O Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki, Auckland 2013 / NZ | [2017/27] |
Former [2015/33] | 01 /
MILLER, Jeremy, Livingston c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland 2013 / NZ | ||
02 /
KAT, Arjen, David c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland 2013 / NZ | |||
Former [2015/32] | 01 /
MILLER, Jeremy, Livingston 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland 2013 / NZ | ||
02 /
KAT, Arjen, David 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland 2013 / NZ | Representative(s) | Harding, Andrew Philip Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [2017/27] |
Former [2015/32] | Harding, Andrew Philip Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13842122.7 | 23.09.2013 | [2017/27] | WO2013NZ00175 | Priority number, date | US201261705340P | 25.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261705340 P | [2015/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014051436 | Date: | 03.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2900305 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2900305 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 03.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/16, E05D7/10, B65D43/16, E05D3/00, E05D3/02, E05B65/52 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
A61M16/16 (EP,GB,US);
A61M16/00 (CN);
E05D7/1066 (EP,GB,US);
B65D43/166 (GB,US);
A61M16/0003 (CN,GB);
B65D43/0225 (GB);
B65D43/26 (US);
E05B65/52 (US);
E05D3/022 (EP,GB,US);
A61M16/162 (EP,US);
A61M2209/06 (US);
E05Y2999/00 (EP,GB,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/32] | A61M16/16, E05D7/10, B65D43/16, E05D3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSKONSTRUKTION FÜR EINE ATEMHILFSVORRICHTUNG | [2015/32] | English: | LID CONSTRUCTION FOR BREATHING APPARATUS | [2015/32] | French: | CONSTRUCTION DE COUVERCLE POUR APPAREIL RESPIRATOIRE | [2015/32] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 01.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.09.2013 | AL | 05.07.2017 | AT | 05.07.2017 | CY | 05.07.2017 | CZ | 05.07.2017 | DK | 05.07.2017 | EE | 05.07.2017 | ES | 05.07.2017 | FI | 05.07.2017 | HR | 05.07.2017 | LT | 05.07.2017 | LV | 05.07.2017 | MC | 05.07.2017 | MK | 05.07.2017 | PL | 05.07.2017 | PT | 05.07.2017 | RO | 05.07.2017 | RS | 05.07.2017 | SE | 05.07.2017 | SI | 05.07.2017 | SK | 05.07.2017 | SM | 05.07.2017 | TR | 05.07.2017 | IE | 23.09.2017 | LU | 23.09.2017 | MT | 23.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | BG | 05.10.2017 | NO | 05.10.2017 | GR | 06.10.2017 | IS | 05.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 23.09.2013 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PT | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 23.09.2017 | ||
LU | 23.09.2017 | ||
MT | 23.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 23.09.2013 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 23.09.2017 | ||
LU | 23.09.2017 | ||
MT | 23.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 23.09.2013 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 23.09.2017 | ||
LU | 23.09.2017 | ||
MT | 23.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 23.09.2013 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 23.09.2017 | ||
LU | 23.09.2017 | ||
MT | 23.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.09.2013 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 23.09.2017 | ||
LU | 23.09.2017 | ||
MT | 23.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 23.09.2017 | ||
LU | 23.09.2017 | ||
MT | 23.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 23.09.2017 | ||
LU | 23.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 23.09.2017 | ||
LU | 23.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 23.09.2017 | ||
LU | 23.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 05.07.2017 | |
NO | 05.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000055419 (AIWA CO); | [X]JP2000070138 (ZOJIRUSHI CORP); | [X]JP3300267B ; | [X]JP2010270966 (ZOJIRUSHI CORP) | International search | [Y]DE2748185 (HESTERBERG & SOEHNE F); | [X]US2008302361 (SNOW JOHN MICHAEL [AU], et al); | [Y]GB2441796 (ACTIP LTD [IE]); | [Y]US2012199513 (WAGNER CHARLES E [US]) | by applicant | JP2000055419 | JP2000070138 | JP3300267B | US2008302361 | JP2010270966 |