EP2918934 - CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAHARA, Takayuki c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Mizuki c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Global IP Europe Patentanwaltskanzlei Pfarrstraße 14 80538 München / DE | [2015/38] | Application number, filing date | 13842421.3 | 30.04.2013 | [2015/38] | WO2013JP62622 | Priority number, date | JP20120212568 | 26.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012212568 | [2015/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014050195 | Date: | 03.04.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2918934 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/02, F04B49/06, F04D15/00 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
F04B41/06 (EP,CN,US);
F04D27/00 (US);
F04B49/02 (EP,CN,US);
F04B49/06 (EP,CN,US);
F04D15/0066 (EP,CN,US);
F04D15/0088 (EP,CN,US);
F24F11/83 (EP,CN,US);
F24F11/84 (EP,CN,US);
F24F11/85 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2015/38] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE | [2015/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE | [2015/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2015 | Translation filed | 14.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 31.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JP2000045982 (TERAL KYOKUTO INC); | [Y]JP2001263255 (SAYAMA SEISAKUSHO KK); | [A]JP2004116328 (BOC TECHNOLOGIES LTD); | [Y]JP2006002594 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2012154544 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP) | by applicant | JP2009133253 |