EP2901285 - A SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR EXECUTING SQL BASIC OPERATORS ON COMPRESSED DATA WITHOUT DECOMPRESSION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SQream Technologies Ltd. Yad Harutzim 12 6770005 Tel Aviv / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Sqream Technologies Ltd Yad Harutzim 12 6770005 Tel Aviv / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VARAKIN, Kostya 30 HaTzvi Boulevard 3435514 Haifa / IL | 02 /
GAL, Ami 21 Yefe Nof Street 7313400 Kfar HaOranim / IL | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Sarpi, Maurizio, et al Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36 00187 Roma / IT | [2020/49] |
Former [2015/32] | Sarpi, Maurizio, et al Studio Ferrario srl Via Collina 36 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 13842661.4 | 24.09.2013 | [2020/49] | WO2013IL50795 | Priority number, date | US201261707008P | 28.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261707008 P | [2015/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014049594 | Date: | 03.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2901285 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2901285 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 03.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/2453, G06F16/30, G06F16/174, G06F16/242, G06F16/245 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
G06F16/2433 (EP,IL,US);
G06F16/1744 (EP,IL,US);
G06F16/2453 (IL,US);
G06F16/24569 (EP,IL,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/24] | G06F17/30, G06F12/00 | ||
Former IPC [2015/32] | G06F12/00, G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG VON SQL-BASIS-OPERATOREN AN KOMPRIMIERTEN DATEN OHNE DEKOMPRIMIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2015/32] | English: | A SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR EXECUTING SQL BASIC OPERATORS ON COMPRESSED DATA WITHOUT DECOMPRESSION PROCESS | [2015/32] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'EXÉCUTER DES OPÉRATEURS DE BASE SQL SURE DES DONNÉES COMPRIMÉES SANS PROCESSUS DE DÉCOMPRESSION | [2015/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 07.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2013 | AL | 02.12.2020 | AT | 02.12.2020 | CY | 02.12.2020 | CZ | 02.12.2020 | DK | 02.12.2020 | EE | 02.12.2020 | ES | 02.12.2020 | FI | 02.12.2020 | HR | 02.12.2020 | IT | 02.12.2020 | LT | 02.12.2020 | LV | 02.12.2020 | MC | 02.12.2020 | MK | 02.12.2020 | MT | 02.12.2020 | NL | 02.12.2020 | PL | 02.12.2020 | RO | 02.12.2020 | RS | 02.12.2020 | SI | 02.12.2020 | SK | 02.12.2020 | SM | 02.12.2020 | BG | 02.03.2021 | NO | 02.03.2021 | GR | 03.03.2021 | IS | 02.04.2021 | PT | 05.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 24.09.2013 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
MK | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 24.09.2013 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 24.09.2013 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 02.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007143248 (UPPALA RADHA K [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0075] *; | [Y] - DANIEL ABADI ET AL, "Integrating compression and execution in column-oriented database systems", ELECTRONIC PROCEEDINGS, ACM SIGMOD/PODS 2006 CONFERENCE : JUNE 26 - 29, 2006, CHICAGO, ILLINOIS, USA, New York, NY, (20060101), doi:10.1145/1142473.1142548, ISBN 978-1-59593-434-5, page 671, XP055271574 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * Section 5.1, second to fourth paragraphs * * Section 5.2, last paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1142473.1142548 | [A] - Miguel C Ferreira, "Compression and Query Execution within Column Oriented Databases", Cambridge, MA, USA, (20050601), pages 1 - 66, URL: http://db.lcs.mit.edu/madden/html/theses/ferreira.pdf, (20130226), XP055054639 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Section 2.2 * * Section 2.3 * * Section 3.5 * * Section 5.1 * | [A] - MIAN LU ET AL, "Relational Query Coprocessing on Graphics Processors", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON DATABASE SYSTEMS, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20091201), vol. 34, no. 4, doi:10.1145/1620585.1620588, ISSN 0362-5915, pages 21 - 1, XP009150443 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1620585.1620588 | International search | [A]WO03096230 (ORACLE INT CORP [US]); | [A]US2008034049 (STOKES TERRY [US]); | [A]US2012054225 (MARWAH VINEET [US], et al); | [AP]US2013166566 (LEMKE CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) | Examination | US2012054225 |