EP2903402 - SHIELDED CONDUCTOR PATH AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yazaki Corporation 4-28 Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0073 / JP | [2015/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANAGIHARA, Yusuke c/o Yazaki Parts Co. Ltd. 653-2 Osaka Kakegawa-shi Shizuoka 437-1421 / JP | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/32] | Application number, filing date | 13842961.8 | 20.09.2013 | WO2013JP75474 | Priority number, date | JP20120215604 | 28.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012215604 | [2015/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014050737 | Date: | 03.04.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2903402 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00, B60R16/02, H01B7/17, H01B7/20, H01B13/22 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
B60R16/0215 (EP,US);
H05K9/0007 (US);
H01B13/22 (US);
H02G3/0406 (US);
H02G3/0462 (EP,US);
H05K9/0018 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGESCHIRMTE LEITERBAHN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2015/32] | English: | SHIELDED CONDUCTOR PATH AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2015/32] | French: | CHEMIN CONDUCTEUR BLINDÉ ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2015/32] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2015 | Translation filed | 09.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 09.10.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2006260898 (AUTO NETWORK GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO, et al); | [Y]JP2009048952 (AUTO NETWORK GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO, et al); | [Y]JP2010027577 (AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD, et al) | by applicant | JP2004171952 |