EP2904524 - GENERATING SNIPPETS FOR PROMINENT USERS FOR INFORMATION RETRIEVAL QUERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2015/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOROHONCEANU, Bogdan 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
SAALWEACHTER, John E. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 03 /
THAKUR, Kumar Mayur 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Sheng 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | Robinson, David Edward Ashdown Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2015/33] | Application number, filing date | 13843158.0 | 03.10.2013 | [2015/33] | WO2013US63269 | Priority number, date | US201213645144 | 04.10.2012 Original published format: US201213645144 | [2015/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014055764 | Date: | 10.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2904524 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06F16/9536 (US);
G06F16/24565 (EP,US);
G06F16/24575 (EP,US);
G06F16/951 (US);
G06F16/9532 (US);
G06F16/9538 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG VON AUSSCHNITTEN FÜR HERAUSRAGENDE BENUTZER FÜR INFORMATIONSERFASSUNGSANFRAGEN | [2015/33] | English: | GENERATING SNIPPETS FOR PROMINENT USERS FOR INFORMATION RETRIEVAL QUERIES | [2015/33] | French: | GÉNÉRATION DE BOUTS DE CODE POUR DES UTILISATEURS ÉMINENTS POUR DES REQUÊTES DE RECHERCHE D'INFORMATIONS | [2015/33] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 26.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2009021135 (ARVIDSON JEFF [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 6, line 4 - page 7, line 3 * * page 9, lines 3-10 * * page 17, lines 2-15 * * page 18, line 14 - page 21, line 13 * * figures 29, 32 *; | [Y]WO2012033797 (GOOGLE INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 14, lines 3-8 ** page 20, line 18 - page 22, line 3 * | International search | [X]US2010115003 (SOULES CRAIG A [US], et al); | [Y]US7725501 (STILLMAN JERRY M [US], et al); | [Y]US8276207 (WALSH RICHARD [US], et al) |