EP2903537 - SUTURE FOR SOFT TISSUE REPAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaplan, Lee D. 2627 South Bayshore Drive, Apt. 2502 Coconut Grove, FL 33133 / US | [2015/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/33] | D'Arcy, Julia Harrison IP 1st Floor Box Tree House Northminster Business Park, Northfield Lane York, YO26 6QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13843242.2 | 02.10.2013 | [2015/33] | WO2013US63111 | Priority number, date | US201261709293P | 03.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261709293 P | US201361792026P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361792026 P | [2015/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014055678 | Date: | 10.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2903537 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04, // A61B17/06 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
A61B17/0401 (EP,US);
A61B17/06166 (EP,US);
A61B17/0487 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0414 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0425 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0427 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0448 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0453 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0464 (US);
A61B2017/06176 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/33] | A61B17/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] | Title | German: | NAHT FÜR WEICHGEWEBEREPARATUR | [2015/33] | English: | SUTURE FOR SOFT TISSUE REPAIR | [2015/33] | French: | SUTURE POUR RÉPARATION DE TISSU MOU | [2015/33] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 31.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/16] | 18.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.11.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2012130422 (HOOTSTEIN SETH M [US]) [X] 1-3,8,9 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0032] * * figures 5A-10 * [Y] 4-7,14; | [X]US2007288023 (PELLEGRINO GREG [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0031] * * figures 1A-3G *; | [Y]WO2009146155 (KAPLAN LEE D [US]) [Y] 4-7 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0051] * * figures 10-13 *; | [YA]US2009299407 (YUAN JIE JENNY [US], et al) [Y] 14 * paragraph [0024]; figures 6a,b * [A] 3; | [A]US2093145 (WALTER CARRUTHERS FRANCIS) [A] 3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2108316 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [A] 13 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2010114162 (BOJARSKI RAY [US], et al); | [X]US8202295 (KAPLAN LEE D [US]); | [X]US2012245629 (GROSS JEFFREY M [CA], et al); | [Y]US2012197294 (MARTIN DANIEL L [US]); | [A]US7445634 (TRIEU HAI H [US]) | by applicant | US2012130422 | US2007288023 | WO2009146155 | US2009299407 | US8202295 | US2008077161 |