EP2904894 - DOUBLE VERTICAL HANGING UNIT, IN THE FORM OF POUCHES, FOR HYDROPONIC PLANT CULTIVATION, PANEL OF DOUBLE VERTICAL HANGING UNITS, IN POUCH FORM, AND GREENHOUSE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Martinez Ruanova, Luis Héctor Alberto Calle Kinchil 224 Casa 1 Colonia Colinas del Ajusco 14208 Delegación Tlalpan Distrito Federal / MX | [2015/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | Temiño Ceniceros, Ignacio Abril Patentes y Marcas, S.L. Calle Zurbano, 76 - 7° 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2015/33] | Temino Ceniceros, Ignacio Abril Abogados Amador de los Rios 1-1° 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 13843471.7 | 04.10.2013 | [2015/33] | WO2013MX00123 | Priority number, date | MX20120011572 | 05.10.2012 Original published format: MX 2012011572 | [2015/33] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014054936 | Date: | 10.04.2014 | Language: | ES | [2014/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2904894 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 10.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/02, A01G31/06, A01G9/14 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
A01G9/025 (EP,US);
A01G31/02 (US);
A01G31/06 (EP,US);
A01G9/14 (US);
A01G9/1407 (EP,US);
Y02A40/25 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/33] | A01G9/02, A01G31/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] | Title | German: | DOPPELTE VERTIKALE HÄNGEVORRICHTUNG IN FORM VON BEUTELN ZUR PFLANZENHYDROKULTUR, PLATTE MIT DOPPELTEN VERTIKALEN HÄNGEVORRICHTUNGEN IN BEUTELFORM UND TREIBHAUSSTRUKTUR | [2015/33] | English: | DOUBLE VERTICAL HANGING UNIT, IN THE FORM OF POUCHES, FOR HYDROPONIC PLANT CULTIVATION, PANEL OF DOUBLE VERTICAL HANGING UNITS, IN POUCH FORM, AND GREENHOUSE STRUCTURE | [2015/33] | French: | UNITÉ SUSPENDUE VERTICALE DOUBLE EN FORME DE SACS POUR LA CULTURE HYDROPONIQUE DE PLANTES, PANNEAU POURVU D'UNITÉS SUSPENDUES VERTICALES DOUBLES EN FORME DE SACS ET STRUCTURE POUR SERRE | [2015/33] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2015 | Translation filed | 04.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 20.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/26] | 06.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1329673 (VENTIMIGLIA F) [Y] 16-19 * figure 1 ** page 1, lines 11-14 *; | [XDAY]FR2902966 (CLAYE JENNY [FR]) [XD] 12-15 * figures 1,6 * * page 1, line 17 * * page 2, lines 18-19 * [A] 1-11,20 [Y] 16-19 | International search | [A]FR2747265 (BLANC PATRICK [FR]); | [A]FR2902967 (CLAYE JENNY ANDREE BERNADETTE [FR]); | [A]ES2317293T (SOPREMA); | [A]GB2454678 (CAMMISH ROBERT [GB]); | [A]WO2010009505 (LEE ALAN SIAN GHEE [SG], et al); | [A]US7856756 (CARUSO STEVEN J [US]); | [A]US2011059518 (BRIBACH CHRISTOPHER JAMES [US], et al); | [A]EP2359680 (JUNGLE ART [FR]); | [A]US2012005958 (LAITSCH ROBERT B [US]) | by applicant | FR2902966 | GB2454678 | CN201781807U | US2012005958 | US2012066972 | MX2012008531 |