EP2907849 - POLYLACTIC ACID RESIN COMPOSITION, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING MOLDED ARTICLE AND POLYLACTIC ACID RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8666 / JP | [2015/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Yoshitake c/o Tokai Plant Toray Industries Inc. 31 Shinpo-machi Tokai-shi Aichi 476-8567 / JP | 02 /
NAOTSUKA, Takuma c/o Tokai Plant Toray Industries Inc. 31 Shinpo-machi Tokai-shi Aichi 476-8567 / JP | 03 /
TACHIBANA, Yasuto c/o Tokai Plant Toray Industries Inc. 31 Shinpo-machi Tokai-shi Aichi 476-8567 / JP | 04 /
OME, Hiroyuki c/o Tokai Plant Toray Industries Inc. 31 Shinpo-machi Tokai-shi Aichi 476-8567 / JP | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13844751.1 | 12.09.2013 | [2015/34] | WO2013JP74766 | Priority number, date | JP20120225544 | 10.10.2012 Original published format: JP 2012225544 | [2015/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014057766 | Date: | 17.04.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2907849 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/04, C08G63/06, C08K3/32, C08L101/16 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
C08K3/32 (EP,US);
C08G63/06 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C08K2003/324 (EP,US);
C08K2003/325 (US);
C08L101/16 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/04, C08K3/32, C08L67/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Title | German: | POLYMILCHSÄUREHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FORMARTIKEL UND EINER POLYMILCHSÄUREHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2015/34] | English: | POLYLACTIC ACID RESIN COMPOSITION, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING MOLDED ARTICLE AND POLYLACTIC ACID RESIN COMPOSITION | [2015/34] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE D'ACIDE POLYLACTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ARTICLE MOULÉ ET D'UNE COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE D'ACIDE POLYLACTIQUE | [2015/34] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2015 | Translation filed | 31.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 29.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/29] | 28.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]WO2012029393 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2007099934 (TEIJIN LTD, et al); | [A]JP2008120894 (TEIJIN LTD, et al); | [A]JP2009079104 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2010001338 (KAO CORP) | by applicant | JP2003192884 | WO2012029393 | WO2009119336 | JP2010084266 | WO2012111587 |