EP2907860 - EMULSION COAGULANT, AND FLAT TIRE REPAIR KIT USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 36-11 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 36-11 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAMATSU, Takahiro c/o The Yokohama Rubber Co. Ltd. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1 Oiwake Hiratsuka City Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/34] | Application number, filing date | 13845844.3 | 08.10.2013 | [2015/34] | WO2013JP77349 | Priority number, date | JP20120224099 | 09.10.2012 Original published format: JP 2012224099 | [2015/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014057937 | Date: | 17.04.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2907860 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2907860 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/00, B29C73/02, C08K3/22, C08K5/5415, C08L1/02, C08L21/00, C09K3/10, // B29C73/16 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
C08K5/5425 (EP,US);
B29C73/163 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,RU,US);
C08K5/5415 (EP,RU,US);
C08L1/02 (EP,RU,US);
C08L1/286 (EP,US);
C09K3/1015 (EP,US);
C08K2003/222 (EP,US);
C08K2003/2224 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L1/286 (EP,US);
C08K5/5415, C08L1/286 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2015/34] | C09K3/00, B29C73/02, C08K3/22, C08K5/5415, C08L1/02, C08L21/00, C09K3/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EMULSIONSGERINNUNGSMITTEL UND REPARATURKIT FÜR PLATTE REIFEN DAMIT | [2015/34] | English: | EMULSION COAGULANT, AND FLAT TIRE REPAIR KIT USING SAME | [2015/34] | French: | COAGULANT D'ÉMULSION ET COFFRET DE RÉPARATION DE PNEU À PLAT L'UTILISANT | [2015/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2015 | Translation filed | 08.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 02.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2013 | AL | 26.07.2017 | AT | 26.07.2017 | CY | 26.07.2017 | CZ | 26.07.2017 | DK | 26.07.2017 | EE | 26.07.2017 | ES | 26.07.2017 | FI | 26.07.2017 | HR | 26.07.2017 | IT | 26.07.2017 | LT | 26.07.2017 | LV | 26.07.2017 | MC | 26.07.2017 | MK | 26.07.2017 | NL | 26.07.2017 | PL | 26.07.2017 | PT | 26.07.2017 | RO | 26.07.2017 | RS | 26.07.2017 | SE | 26.07.2017 | SI | 26.07.2017 | SK | 26.07.2017 | SM | 26.07.2017 | TR | 26.07.2017 | IE | 08.10.2017 | LU | 08.10.2017 | MT | 08.10.2017 | BG | 26.10.2017 | GB | 26.10.2017 | NO | 26.10.2017 | GR | 27.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | FR | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | IS | 26.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 08.10.2013 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MK | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IE | 08.10.2017 | ||
LU | 08.10.2017 | ||
MT | 08.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GB | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 08.10.2013 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MK | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IE | 08.10.2017 | ||
LU | 08.10.2017 | ||
MT | 08.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GB | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 08.10.2013 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MK | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
IE | 08.10.2017 | ||
LU | 08.10.2017 | ||
MT | 08.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GB | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 08.10.2013 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
IE | 08.10.2017 | ||
LU | 08.10.2017 | ||
MT | 08.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GB | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 08.10.2013 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
IE | 08.10.2017 | ||
LU | 08.10.2017 | ||
MT | 08.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GB | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
IE | 08.10.2017 | ||
LU | 08.10.2017 | ||
MT | 08.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GB | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
LU | 08.10.2017 | ||
MT | 08.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GB | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
LU | 08.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GB | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
LU | 08.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GB | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 26.07.2017 | |
NO | 26.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009023837 (OKAMATSU TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0069] * * figure - *; | [A]US2011077327 (OKAMATSU TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0052] * * figure 1 * | International search | [AP]JP5282856B (THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD.); | [A]JPH1071806 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2009041006 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) | Examination | US2009318614 | by applicant | JP2011246610 | JP4245654B | JP2011143631 | JP2011143632 |