EP2909145 - METHODS OF REDUCING SCALANT FORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEMIRA OYJ Porkkalankatu 3 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2015/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOORE, Lucas 206 Shawnee Trail Marietta, GA 30067 / US | 02 /
CARCELLER, Rosa Maerinne 3 02160 Espoo / FI | [2015/35] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy, Helsinki & Oulu P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/35] | Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 Antinkatu 3 C 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 13846348.4 | 11.10.2013 | [2015/35] | WO2013US64469 | Priority number, date | US201261716018P | 19.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261716018 P | [2015/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014062487 | Date: | 24.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2909145 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C01F11/18, C01F11/46, C02F5/12, // C02F101/10, C02F1/44 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
C02F5/12 (EP,US);
B01D61/10 (EP,US);
B01D65/08 (EP,US);
C02F1/441 (EP,US);
C02F1/683 (US);
B01D2321/168 (EP,US);
C02F2101/10 (EP,US);
C02F2101/101 (EP,US);
C02F2103/08 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/35] | C01F11/18, C01F11/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER BILDUNG VON ABLAGERUNGEN | [2015/35] | English: | METHODS OF REDUCING SCALANT FORMATION | [2015/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE RÉDUCTION DE LA FORMATION DE TARTRE | [2015/35] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 11.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.06.2018 | 26.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/24] | 05.02.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 12.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5232603 (DENZINGER WALTER [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-14 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 49 * * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 30 * [I] 5,15; | [XI]WO9534511 (HERC PROD INC [US]) [X] 1-4,9,11-15 * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 3 * * page 15, line 8 - line 10 * * claims 1,3,5,6 * [I] 5-8,10; | [I]US5906971 (LARK JOHN C [US]) [I] 1-15 * column 2, line 3 - line 29 ** column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 4 *; | [XI]EP1976805 (KEMIRA OYJ [FI]) [X] 1-8,11-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0014] , [0020] , [0029] - [0033] - [0049] - [0056] * * table 1 * [I] 9,10,15 | International search | [A]KR930007979 (SHIN ETSU CHEM. CO., LTD.); | [A]WO9534511 (HERC PROD INC [US]); | [X]US5906971 (LARK JOHN C [US]); | [A]KR20070053159 (COATEX SAS [FR]); | [A]US2010292106 (SANDERS JANNIFER [US], et al) |